THE SWEATSHOP 2, LLC
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | A Benjamin Goldgar |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-07683 |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Debtor
THE SWEATSHOP 2, LLC
226 Lexington Court
Grayslake, IL 60030 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Joseph E Cohen
Joseph E. Cohen, Chapter 7 Trustee Cohen & Krol 790 Estate Drive Suite 180
Deerfield, IL 60015 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 05/24/2024 12:09 AM CDT |
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Eric G Zelazny on behalf of THE SWEATSHOP 2, LLC (Zelazny, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/23 12:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-07683 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47937105. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Zelazny, Eric) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation)
Thu 05/23 1:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/27/2024 at 02:30 PM via Zoom - Cohen: Meeting ID 820 622 7843, Passcode 9022285259, Phone 1-872-201-1214. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |