Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-08960
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 24, 2024 1:01 AM MST
Defendant
Jennifer Duncan (2)
Represented By
Sigberto Myers Celaya
Law Office Of Sigberto M Celaya PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Luis Montoya (1)
Represented By
Kristian Harrison Salter
Law Office Of Rubin Salter Jr.
contact info
Material Witness
Material Witnesses
Represented By
Natalie Hubbs Haywood
Law Office Of Natalie H Haywood PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/24/2024 2:39 AM MST
Monday, May 20, 2024
Arrest of Anthony Luis Montoya, Jennifer Duncan on 5/20/2024. (CXE) *Modified defendant #2 last name on docket text as indicated in Complaint on 5/23/2024 (CXE).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
1 1 *COMPLAINT as to Anthony Luis Montoya, Jennifer Duncan. (CXE) *Modified defendant #2 last name on docket text as indicated in Complaint on 5/23/2024 (CXE).
Related: [-]
2 2 *AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Anthony Luis Montoya, Jennifer Duncan signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. (CXE) *Modified defendant #2 last name on docket text as indicated in Complaint on 5/23/2024 (CXE).
Related: [-]
3 3 *AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Anthony Luis Montoya, Jennifer Duncan signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. (CXE) *Modified defendant #2 last name on docket text as indicated in Complaint on 5/23/2024 (CXE).
Related: [-]