California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01033
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 24, 2024 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Shamsi Abdo (1)
Represented By
Lewis Christian Muller
Lewis C Muller Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Zahra Abdollahi (2)
Represented By
Andre Rios Bollinger
Rios Bollinger Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lisa Jeannette Sanniti
contact info

GPO Oct 11 2024
JUDGMENT as to Zahra Abdollahi (2), Count(s) 2, 3 years supervised probation. No fine. $25.00 S/A. $114,972.65 Restitution. 100 community service hours. Appeal rights waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (rxc)
GPO Nov 06 2024
JUDGMENT as to Shamsi Abdo (1). Count 1: Defendant committed to Probation for a term of five (5) years; fine waived; $100 penalty assessment imposed; $114,972.65 restitution ordered; appeal rights waived. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (lrf)

Docket last updated: 05/24/2024 1:46 AM PDT
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
1 1 INFORMATION as to Shamsi Abdo (1) count(s) 1, Zahra Abdollahi (2) count(s) 2. (mme)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Shamsi Abdo held on 5/22/2024. Rule 5 advisement provided. Bond set at defendant's own recognizance as to Shamsi Abdo (1). Bond packet due by 05/29/2024. Abstract issued to USMS. Defendant ordered to go to USMS for fingerprint and release. Attorney Lewis Muller is confirmed. Arraignment on Information as to Shamsi Abdo (1) Count 1 held on 5/22/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Change of Plea Hearing as to Shamsi Abdo held on 5/22/2024. Plea Tendered by Shamsi Abdo Guilty on count 1 of the Information. Excludable(s) started as to Shamsi Abdo: XK: 05/22/2024-08/12/2024. PSR Ordered. All pending motions withdrawn. Pending hearing dates vacated. Any objections to Findings due within 14 days. Sentence With PSR set for 8/12/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (Interpreter Jawnid Samaday, Farsi). (CD# 5/22/2024 DDL 24 9:04-9:48). (Plaintiff Attorney Lisa Sanniti, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Lewis Muller, CJA). (Thalia Duarte, PTSO). (bas1) Modified on 5/22/2024 to update bond due date. NEF REGENERATED. (bas1).
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Zahra Abdollahi held on 5/22/2024. Rule 5 advisement provided. Bond set at defendant's own recognizance as to Zahra Abdollahi (2). Bond packet due by 05/29/2024. Abstract issued to USMS. Defendant ordered to go to USMS for fingerprint and release. Attorney Andre Rios Bollinger confirmed. Arraignment on Information as to Zahra Abdollahi (2) Count 2 held on 5/22/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Change of Plea Hearing as to Zahra Abdollahi held on 5/22/2024. Plea entered by Zahra Abdollahi (2) Guilty Count 2. Excludable(s) started as to Zahra Abdollahi: XK: 05/22/2024-08/22/2024. PSR Ordered. All pending motions withdrawn. Pending hearing dates vacated. Sentence With PSR set for 8/22/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Judge update in case as to Zahra Abdollahi. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner added to the case. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 24-cr-01033-DDL-2 (CD# 5/22/2024 DDL 24 9:48-10:08). (Plaintiff Attorney Lisa Sanniti, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Andre Bollinger, CJA). (Thalia Duarte, PTSO). (bas1)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Farsi Interpreter needed as to Shamsi Abdo (no document attached) (bas1)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Zahra Abdollahi (no document attached) (bas1)
Related: [-]
6 6 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Shamsi Abdo. (mme)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS Read Receipt
7 7 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Zahra Abdollahi. (mme)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS Read Receipt
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Shamsi Abdo (1): own recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 05/22/2024. (bas1)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Zahra Abdollahi (2) own recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 05/22/2024. (bas1)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Shamsi Abdo: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 05/22/2024. (bas1)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Zahra Abdollahi: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 05/22/2024. (bas1)
Related: [-]
13 13 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Shamsi Abdo(bas1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restitution Addendum
14 14 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Zahra Abdollahi(bas1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restitution Addendum
15 15 CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner by Shamsi Abdo. (bas1)
Related: [-]
16 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Zahra Abdollahi. (bas1)
Related: [-]
17 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Shamsi Abdo: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 05/22/2024. (bas1)
Related: [-]