Texas Western District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00086
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 24, 2024 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (1)
Represented By
Luis A. Chavez
The Chavez Law Firm
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-Midland/Odessa
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Heather Haywood
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/24/2024 3:33 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (1). (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado for 5/1/2024 (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
Arrest of Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luis A. Chavez appearing for Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado . Attorney Luis A. Chavez added to party Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado(pty:dft) (Chavez, Luis) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado on 5/2/2024. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Notice of Correction: 8 Order Appointing Federal Public Defender docketed in error. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Initial Appearance as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado held on 5/7/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR-Midland.) (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 5/21/2024 09:00 AM in Midland before Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
12 12 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (Chavez, Luis) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (kg) [7:24-mj-00107-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Midland-Odessa Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (bot1)
Related: [-]
14 14 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
16 16 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jose Alberto Gonzalez-Delgado (bot2)
Related: [-]