Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00716
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Sylvia Howard
Defendant
Christian McMullen
Plaintiff
Myriam Zayas
975 NE DISCOVERY DRIVE UNIT 212
ISSAQUAH, WA 98029
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Christina McMullen
Terminated: 05/29/2024


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
10 10 order 1 - Order ~Util - Terminate Case Fri 02/07 8:39 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court dismisses the case without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) Modified re mailout information on 2/7/2025 (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 01/16 2:30 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. To determine whether the Court should abstain and dismiss this matter, Plaintiff must file a response to this order by 1/30/2025 and list any state proceedings involving Plaintiff and either Defendant or DCYF and the child referred to as AC in the amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not timely respond with the relevant information, the Court will dismiss the case. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
8 8 trial Exhibit Tue 06/25 10:11 AM
EXHIBIT filed by Plaintiff Myriam Zayas. (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/29 1:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Myriam Zayas. (SB)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/29 1:00 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends review by the assigned District Judge under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B). Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Document(s) Tue 05/28 4:51 PM
PROPOSED Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Myriam Zayas. (SB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 PROPOSED Summons
Thursday, May 23, 2024
4 4 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 05/23 10:49 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re2 Attachment 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan. ***Action Required*** Redaction. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) Modified on 5/23/2024 correct link to unredacted document (CDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
2 2 sealdoc Sealed Document Thu 05/23 10:28 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT Attachment filed by Plaintiff Myriam Zayas. Administratively sealed due to personal identifiers. (KS)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/23 10:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan filed by Myriam Zayas. (KS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs PROPOSED Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Attachment,
Att: 4 PROPOSED Summons,
Att: 5 PROPOSED Summons,
Att: 6 Email Transmission of Case