Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:24-cv-01259
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 4:36 AM EST
Defendant
Jennifer Irvine
Represented By
Jana Ranieri Cortina
Frank Butler P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Suntime Boat Club, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Gonzalez
Gonzalez Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By
James M. Kaplan
Kaplan Zeena, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Heifferman
Kennedys Cmk, LLP
contact info
Jeremy S. Baum
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Troy Irvine
Terminated: 11/01/2024
Mediator
Gerald Albrecht
Terminated: 08/08/2024
Represented By
Gerald T. Albrecht
Albrecht Mediation Services
contact info
Mediator
Andrew Winston
Terminated: 10/30/2024


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/10 10:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Entry of Final Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Markel American Insurance Company.(Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 23, 2025
39 39 adr Mediation report Thu 01/23 3:41 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on January 22, 2025. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Luckman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
38 38 order Order Fri 12/06 1:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: An earlier order (Doc. 27 ) refers this action to mediation and appoints Gerald Albrecht as mediator. Another order (Doc. 31) terminates Gerald Albrecht as mediator and appoints Andrew Winston as mediator. A mediation report (Doc. 34) announces that the parties conducted mediation on October 30, 2024, which resulted in impasse. The clerk terminated Andrew Winston as mediator. Because the parties notify (Doc. 37 ) that a second mediation will occur before Andrew Winston, the clerk must add Andrew Winston as mediator. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/6/2024. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
37 37 adr Notice of selection of mediator Thu 12/05 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Andrew Y. Winston, Esq. as mediator by Jennifer Irvine.(Cortina, Jana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
36 36 respoth Response Wed 11/20 10:32 AM
RESPONSE re17 Notice of appearance,34 Mediation report to Request for Admissions by Suntime Boat Club, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
35 35 order Order Fri 11/01 3:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In accord with the plaintiff's notice (Doc. 33 ), the action against Troy Irvine is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk is DIRECTED to remove Tony Irvine from the docket. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/1/2024. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
34 34 adr Mediation report Wed 10/30 3:00 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on. (Luckman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Mon 08/19 12:27 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Markel American Insurance Company (Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 08/14 11:04 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 30, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. before Andrew Y. Winston, Esq. (Baum, Jeremy) Modified text on 8/14/2024 (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/08 11:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The plaintiff's unopposed motion (Docs. 28 and 30 ) to substitute the mediator is GRANTED. Andrew Winston is SUBSTITUTED as mediator. The clerk must terminate Gerald Albrecht from the service list and add Andrew Winston to the service list. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/8/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/08 10:36 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Substitute Mediator by Markel American Insurance Company. (Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
29 29 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jennifer Irvine. (Cortina, Jana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
28 28 motion Substitute Party Thu 08/01 1:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party TO SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR by Markel American Insurance Company. (Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
27 27 6 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 07/25 5:35 PM
ORDER appointing Gerald Albrecht as mediator; designating Jeremy Baum as lead counsel; directing lead counsel to coordinate the date and time of mediation and to file a notice of mediation within seven days after this order; directing the parties to mediate no later than DECEMBER 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/25/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 07/25 5:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone; Bench trial set for the NOVEMBER 2024 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/25/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
25 25 misc Case Management Report Wed 07/24 4:00 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
24 24 service Summons returned executed Wed 07/17 12:04 PM
RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2024 by Markel American Insurance Company as to Troy Irvine.(Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, July 12, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/12 4:01 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Suntime Boat Club, Inc..(Gonzalez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 07/09 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Gonzalez on behalf of Suntime Boat Club, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Michael Gonzalez. (Gonzalez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/08 4:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The unopposed motion (Doc. 19 ) to extend the time within which to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. No later than JULY 12, 2024, Suntime Boat Club, Inc., must answer. Also, a review of the motion shows that Suntime Boat Club, Inc., failed to comply with Local Rule 1.08. Suntime Boat Club, Inc., is WARNED that repeated failure to comply with the Local Rules might result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/8/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 07/08 12:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Gonzalez of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 07/08 11:46 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Suntime Boat Club, Inc. (Gonzalez, Michael) Modified on 7/8/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/03 5:16 PM
Defendant, Jennifer Irvine's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Jennifer Irvine.(Cortina, Jana)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of appearance Wed 07/03 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Gonzalez on behalf of Suntime Boat Club, Inc. (Gonzalez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
16 16 service Summons returned executed Mon 07/01 1:25 PM
RETURN of service executed on 06/11/2024 by Markel American Insurance Company as to Suntime Boat Club, Inc..(Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, June 27, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/27 4:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion (Doc. 12 ) to extend the time within which to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. No later than JULY 8, 2024, the defendants must respond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/27/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons returned executed Thu 06/27 1:43 PM
RETURN of service executed on 06/05/2024 by Markel American Insurance Company as to Jennifer Irvine.(Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Wed 06/26 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Jeremy S. Baum on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company (Baum, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 06/26 2:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Jennifer Irvine.(Cortina, Jana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Defendant Motion for Extension of Time
Thursday, May 30, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/30 1:33 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Markel American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Group, Inc. for Markel American Insurance Company.. (Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 service Summons issued Wed 05/29 9:37 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Jennifer Irvine, Troy Irvine, Suntime Boat Club, Inc. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 05/28 1:44 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Markel American Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 05/28 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by James M. Kaplan on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: James M. Kaplan. (Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 05/28 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed summons Tue 05/28 8:50 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Markel American Insurance Company. (Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed summons Tue 05/28 8:50 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Markel American Insurance Company. (Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed summons Tue 05/28 8:49 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Markel American Insurance Company. (Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/24 3:22 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kimberly Heifferman and James M. Kaplan of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/24 3:21 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-1259-SDM-AAS. (AJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/24 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer Irvine, Troy Irvine, Suntime Boat Club, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22128404) filed by Markel American Insurance Company.(Kaplan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet