New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:24-cv-04005
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 4:42 AM EST
Defendant
William Moses Co. Inc.
Plaintiff
Stefan Jeremiah
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/19 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) William Moses Co. Inc.. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/18 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Wed 09/11 10:35 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to William Moses Co. Inc.(km)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Wed 09/11 9:45 AM
AFFIRMATION of Craig Sanders in Support re:8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default
8 8 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Wed 09/11 9:43 AM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 9/11/2024 (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/05 3:33 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. William Moses Co. Inc. served on 6/5/2024, answer due 6/26/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Clerk. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Tue 05/28 11:03 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 05/28 10:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Moses Co. Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/28 10:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/28 10:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/28 10:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
4 4 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Fri 05/24 10:25 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/24 10:24 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Moses Co. Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/24 10:23 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/24 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against William Moses Co. Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29398093)Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Photograph