Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Keith A Pesto
Case #: 3:24-cv-00114
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Petitioner
MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH
Respondent
DHS
Respondent
FABER
Respondent
ICE
Respondent
WARDEN OF MOSHANNON VALLEY PROCESSING CENTER

GPO Jan 15 2025
provide notice of the same to this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 1/15/2025. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. An Immigration Judge shall provide petitioner with an individualized bond hearing within 7-10 days from the date of this Order and the respondent shall

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 respoth Response (other - do not select for response to motion) Fri 02/21 9:51 AM
RESPONSE to14 Notice of Immigration Judge's Order, filed by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Envelope
motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Fri 02/21 9:53 AM
W/15 MOTION for Immediate Release by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Wed 02/05 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Immigration Judge's Order by DHS, FABER, ICE, WARDEN OF MOSHANNON VALLEY PROCESSING CENTER re12 Order, (Lenhardt, Ross) Modified text on 2/5/2025 to add filer. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Tue 01/21 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling of Custody Redetermination Hearing by DHS, FABER, ICE re12 Order, (Lenhardt, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/15 4:54 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. An Immigration Judge shall provide petitioner with an individualized bond hearing within 7-10 days from the date of this Order and the respondent shall provide notice of the same to this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 1/15/2025. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
11 11 misc Addendum in Support Mon 11/18 2:08 PM
Addendum by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH in Support of4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, September 27, 2024
10 10 respoth Response to Habeas Petition Fri 09/27 2:12 PM
RESPONSE to4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DHS, FABER, ICE, WARDEN OF MOSHANNON VALLEY PROCESSING CENTER. (Lenhardt, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed as to USA Thu 08/29 3:23 PM
Return of Service Returned Executed by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. DHS served on 7/29/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; FABER served on 7/29/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; ICE served on 7/29/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; WARDEN OF MOSHANNON VALLEY PROCESSING CENTER served on 7/26/2024, answer due 9/24/2024. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
8 8 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Wed 08/07 9:03 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DHS, FABER, ICE, WARDEN OF MOSHANNON VALLEY PROCESSING CENTER. (Lenhardt, Ross)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ross E. Lenhardt on behalf of DHS, FABER, ICE, WARDEN OF MOSHANNON VALLEY PROCESSING CENTER. (Lenhardt, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
6 6 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 07/12 11:11 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 27, 2024
5 5 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support - Other Thu 06/27 12:02 PM
BRIEF in Support of4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
4 4 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 06/27 12:00 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/27 11:55 AM
RULE and ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Marshal shall make service of the petition and this Rule and Order on the respondents and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania, costs to be borne by the United States. Within sixty days of service, respondent, through the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania, shall file a response to the allegations in the petition for the writ of habeas corpus, showing cause, if any, why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 6/27/2024. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
2 2 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 05/24 2:28 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/24 2:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MERCY COFFIE-JOSEPH. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Habeas Petition lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Brief in Support,
Att: 3 Envelope