Tomasso v. Romano et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | P Casey Pitts |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-03162 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday May 24, 2024 12:13 PM PDT |
Defendant
Roxanne Bowman
|
|
Defendant
ChargePoint Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bruce Chizen
|
|
Defendant
Axel Harries
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Harris
|
|
Defendant
Susan Heystee
|
|
Defendant
Rex S. Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Mark Leschly
|
|
Defendant
Michael Linse
|
|
Defendant
Pasquale Romano
|
|
Defendant
Ekta Singh-Bushell
|
|
Defendant
G. Richard Wagoner Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Rick Wilmer
|
|
Plaintiff
Jacopo Tomasso
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/13 9:39 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Judge Trina L Thompson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 06/05 4:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge.You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/05 7:49 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacopo Tomasso.. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 06/03 10:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jacopo Tomasso. Service waived by Roxanne Bowman waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; ChargePoint Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Bruce Chizen waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Axel Harries waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Jeffrey Harris waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Susan Heystee waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Rex S. Jackson waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Mark Leschly waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Michael Linse waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Pasquale Romano waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Ekta Singh-Bushell waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; G. Richard Wagoner Jr. waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Rick Wilmer waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024.(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Executed Chizen Waiver, | ||
Att: 2 Executed ChargePoint Waiver, | ||
Att: 3 Executed Harries Waiver, | ||
Att: 4 Executed Harris Waiver, | ||
Att: 5 Executed Heystee Waiver, | ||
Att: 6 Executed Jackson Waiver, | ||
Att: 7 Executed Leschly Waiver, | ||
Att: 8 Executed Linse Waiver, | ||
Att: 9 Executed Romano Waiver, | ||
Att: 10 Executed Singh-Bushell Waiver, | ||
Att: 11 Executed Wagoner Waiver, | ||
Att: 12 Executed Wilmer Waiver | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 05/28 2:41 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2024, 10:00 AM in San Jose - Telephonic Only. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/28 2:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Roxanne Bowman, ChargePoint Holdings, Inc., Bruce Chizen, Axel Harries, Jeffrey Harris, Susan Heystee, Rex S. Jackson, Mark Leschly, Michael Linse, Pasquale Romano, Ekta Singh-Bushell, G. Richard Wagoner Jr., Rick Wilmer. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 05/24 1:31 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/7/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 05/24 11:31 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jacopo Tomasso re1 Complaint, (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 05/24 11:29 AM
Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/24 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT against Roxanne Bowman, ChargePoint Holdings, Inc., Bruce Chizen, Axel Harries, Jeffrey Harris, Susan Heystee, Rex S. Jackson, Mark Leschly, Michael Linse, Pasquale Romano, Ekta Singh-Bushell, G. Richard Wagoner Jr., Rick Wilmer ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19449367.). Filed by Jacopo Tomasso.(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |