New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:24-cv-04027
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
Andela Inc.
Represented By
David Charles Kurtz
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Jonathan Persky
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Adam Phillip Samansky
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo, P.C. (ma)
contact info
Christopher R Deubert
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Courtney Machi
Represented By
David Charles Kurtz
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Jonathan Persky
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Adam Phillip Samansky
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo, P.C. (ma)
contact info
Christopher R Deubert
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Toptal, LLC
Represented By
Megan Alicia Behrman
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Kevin Michael McDonough
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Jacob Hershel Nemon
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
76 76 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kara Marie Cormier on behalf of Andela Inc., Courtney Machi..(Cormier, Kara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
75 75 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 9:27 AM
ORDER granting74 Motion for Jacqueline C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
74 74 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 11:48 AM
MOTION for Jacqueline C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30910560. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Andela Inc., Courtney Machi. Return Date set for 4/10/2025 at 10:46 AM..(Johnson, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jacqueline C. Johnson In Support Of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline Johnson
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 04/10 2:03 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 74 MOTION for Jacqueline C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30910560. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]