Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:24-cv-00529
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Case in other court:The District Court for Comanche County, CJ-24-00100
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 3:33 AM CST
Defendant
Benchmark Insurance Company
Represented By
Sterling E Pratt
Fenton Fenton Smith Reneau & Moon
contact info
Jason M. Chodos
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bad Boys Fitness Inc
Represented By
Clay R Zelbst
Zelbst Holmes & Butler
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sedgwick
Terminated: 06/26/2024
Represented By
Kail W Hidalgo
Shackelford, Bowen, Mckinley & Norton, LLP
contact info
Bruce R Wilkin
Winstead Pc - Houston
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
21 21 order Administrative Closing Order Tue 07/09 10:33 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER : This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 7/9/2024. (ekw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 07/01 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Bad Boys Fitness Inc (Zelbst, Clay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 06/26 2:59 PM
ORDER denying as moot11 defendant Sedgwick's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition Motion to Dismiss, as the claims against defendant Sedgwick have been dismissed. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 6/26/2024. (ks)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/26 12:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Sedgwick Only by Bad Boys Fitness Inc. (Zelbst, Clay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/20 3:16 PM
ORDER . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties shall file any stipulation of dismissal without prejudice as to Plaintiffs claims against Sedgwick within seven days of the date of this Order, or by June 27, 2024. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 6/20/2024. (cps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/19 1:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition filed by Bad Boys Fitness Inc. (Zelbst, Clay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 06/18 2:10 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Benchmark Insurance Company shall file its responsive motion or pleading to the Amended Petition on or before July 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 6/18/2024. (cps)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/18 10:22 AM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
13 13 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/10 3:35 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kail W Hidalgo on behalf of Sedgwick (Hidalgo, Kail)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/10 3:31 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Bruce R Wilkin on behalf of Sedgwick (Wilkin, Bruce)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 06/10 1:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition by Sedgwick. (Wilkin, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
10 10 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 05/30 1:45 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jason M. Chodos on behalf of Benchmark Insurance Company (Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate Thu 05/30 9:31 AM
CERTIFICATE . (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Thu 05/30 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Benchmark Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/29 11:17 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Jason Chodos shall be admitted to this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case, provide counsel submits his ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 5/29/2024. (cps)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Fri 05/24 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4440907 by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 PHV FORM OF JMC
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/24 1:45 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Petition. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Benchmark shall file its responsive motion or pleading to the Amended Petition on or before June 21, 2024. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 5/24/2024. (cps)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Fri 05/24 12:36 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Benchmark Insurance Company . (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/24 12:32 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 05/24 12:23 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Sterling E Pratt on behalf of Benchmark Insurance Company (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/24 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court for Comanche County, case number CJ-2024-100 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Amended Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- NAIC For Benchmark,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- NAIC For Sedgwick,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Consent To Removal,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Fri 05/24 2:11 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4440904. (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]