Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10231

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:24-ap-01019
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Allen Michael Abraham
35 Buckskin Road
Bell Canyon, CA 91307
Represented By
Allen Michael Abraham
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Othon
5850 Canoga Ave., Suite 400
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Lior Katz
Katz Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Othon
5850 Canoga Ave., Suite 400
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Lior Katz
Katz Law, Apc
contact info
Trustee
Amy L Goldman (TR)
633 W 5th Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 05/23 8:10 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 07/17/2025 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank BlvdWoodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (JC)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Othon
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
18 18 misc Status report Wed 05/14 4:49 PM
Status report (Joint) Filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Othon, Richard Othon Related [+]. (Katz, Lior)
Related: [-] Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Sunday, April 06, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/06 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 04/04 12:29 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Pursuant to Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/4/2025 (JC)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, March 27, 2025
15 15 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 03/27 9:02 AM
Stipulation By Patricia Othon, Richard Othon and Allen Michael Abraham to Extend Deadlines Pursuant to Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Othon, Richard Othon (Katz, Lior)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/15 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Mon 01/13 4:15 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Pursuant to Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2025 (JC)
Related: [-] 12
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Mon 01/13 4:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 05/21/2025 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (JC)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Othon
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 01/10 4:00 PM
Stipulation By Patricia Othon, Richard Othon and Allen Michael Abraham to Extend Deadlines Pursuant to Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Othon, Richard Othon (Katz, Lior)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Mon 09/16 8:11 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/18/2025 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (JC)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Othon
Sunday, September 15, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 09/15 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Friday, September 13, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 09/13 5:05 PM
Status Conference And Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 9/13/2024. (LF1)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 09/13 5:07 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/18/2025 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (LF1)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Othon
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 misc Status report Thu 08/29 3:57 PM
Status report (Joint) Filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Othon, Richard Othon Related [+]. (Katz, Lior)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
8 8 notice Notice Tue 07/09 12:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Third-Party Complaint Filed by Defendant Allen Michael Abraham Related [+]. (Tahmazian, Jilbert)
Related: [-] 6 Third-Party Complaint by Allen Michael Abraham against Sosi Getzoian . filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Allen Michael Abraham, Defendant Allen Michael Abraham,7 Summons Returned Unexecuted Re: Sosi Getzoian
Monday, July 08, 2024
7 7 cmp Summons Service Unexecuted Mon 07/08 4:35 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted Re: Sosi Getzoian (Tahmazian, Jilbert)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Third-Party Complaint Mon 07/08 4:33 PM
Third-Party Complaint by Allen Michael Abraham against Sosi Getzoian . (Tahmazian, Jilbert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
5 5 notice Notice Fri 07/05 10:39 AM
Notice of rescheduled status conference [ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION] (JC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 07/03 2:24 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 09/13/2024 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (JC)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Othon
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/24 4:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Allen Michael Abraham. (Tahmazian, Jilbert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/24 1:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Allen Michael Abraham 5/24/2024 (Katz, Lior)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 05/24 11:07 AM
Summons Issued on Allen Michael Abraham Date Issued 5/24/2024, Answer Due 6/24/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (LF1)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Patricia Othon, Plaintiff Richard Othon
Thursday, May 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/23 4:12 PM
Adversary case 1:24-ap-01019. Complaint by Patricia Othon, Richard Othon against Allen Michael Abraham. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Katz, Lior)
Related: [-]