Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00386
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 3:36 AM CST
Defendant
Omachron Alpha Inc.
Represented By
Brian M. Buroker
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Ashbey N Morgan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark Nolan Reiter
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Brian Ashley Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Nathan Robert Curtis
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher Llc - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Omachron Intellectual Property Inc.
Represented By
Brian M. Buroker
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Ashbey N Morgan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark Nolan Reiter
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Brian Ashley Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Nathan Robert Curtis
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher Llc - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
SharkNinja, Inc.
Represented By
Brian M. Buroker
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Ashbey N Morgan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark Nolan Reiter
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Brian Ashley Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Nathan Robert Curtis
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher Llc - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Dyson Technology Limited
Represented By
Caitlin Marie Dean
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Jay Emerick
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Bryan S Hales
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Eric D Hayes
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dyson, Inc.
Represented By
Caitlin Marie Dean
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Jay Emerick
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Bryan S Hales
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Eric D Hayes
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
77 77 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 02/03 3:47 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NKL)
Related: [-]
76 76 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/03 3:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Motion(s)35 ,31 ,32 ,69 ,70 ,61 terminated). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/3/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
75 75 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/31 4:42 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by SharkNinja, Inc., Omachron Alpha Inc., Omachron Intellectual Property Inc.. (Rosenthal, Brian)
Related: [-]