New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anne M Nardacci
Referred: Paul J Evangelista
Case #: 1:24-cv-00705
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Keena Staffing
Represented By
John Tyler Mills
Gordon & Rees Llp - New York Office
contact info
Joseph Salvo
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Rosevear
Represented By
Todd S. Garber
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/10 2:42 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 12/10/2024.(ham)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/06 2:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Keena Staffing. (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
18 18 notice Notice - Other Thu 10/31 8:49 AM
TEXT NOTICE: The Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 11/4/2024 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel, is ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (tab)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
17 17 misc Civil Case Management Plan Mon 10/28 4:51 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Keena Staffing. (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/28 2:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by Nicole Rosevear. (Garber, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Salvo on behalf of Keena Staffing (Salvo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss/Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Mon 10/07 10:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and/or Failure to State a Claim filed by Keena Staffing. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Anne Nardacci Response to Motion due by 10/28/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/4/2024 (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 09/10 2:28 PM
COURT NOTICE of Change in Conference Date and Time: The Initial Conference is now reset for 11/4/2024 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/28/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The conference will be conducted by telephone. Counsel are to DIAL IN @ 518-217-2288 and use Conference ID 533 522 609 # to connect to the conference call. (tab)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Letter Request Tue 09/10 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Keena Staffing requesting Extension of time to answer complaint : Keena Staffing answer due 10/7/2024. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/10/2024. (tab)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 09/06 5:25 PM
Letter Motion for Keena Staffing requesting Extension of time to answer complaint . (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 08/12 11:50 AM
COURT NOTICE of Hearing: The Initial Conference is reset for 10/4/2024 @ 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/27/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The conference will be conducted by telephone. Counsel are to DIAL IN @ 518-217-2288 and use Conference ID 533 522 609 # to connect to the conference call (tab)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/12 11:46 AM
TEXT ORDER granting8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Keena Staffing. Keena Staffing answer now due 9/6/2024. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/6/2024. (tab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/07 5:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by Keena Staffing. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2024 Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 06/26 3:52 PM
TEX ORDER granting6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Keena Staffing. Keena Staffing answer now due 8/6/2024. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/26/2024. (tab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/18 11:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Keena Staffing. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2024 Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/18 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Tyler Mills on behalf of Keena Staffing (Mills, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 06/13 10:31 AM
***Answer due date set for Keena Staffing answer due 6/19/2024. (ham)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/12 4:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint served on Sam Rathbun on 05/29/2024, filed by Nicole Rosevear. (Garber, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 05/28 12:15 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re1 Complaint, to display the correct receipt number on the Civil Cover Sheet and in the docket entry. (tll)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Fri 05/24 1:13 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/22/2024 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/15/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tll, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/24 1:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Keena Staffing. (tll, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/24 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FILED against Keena Staffing (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6743347) filed by Nicole Rosevear.(tll, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet