Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 3:24-bk-41172
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jun 25, 2024
Dismissed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024

Debtor
BT Property Investments LLC
4103 Bridgeport Way W Ste D
University Place, WA 98466-4332
Represented By
BT Property Investments LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Mark D Waldron
Mark Waldron, Chapter 7 Panel Trustee 6824 19th St. W. Pmb 250
University Place, WA 98466
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 05/25/2024 12:02 AM PDT
Friday, May 24, 2024
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC) Fri 05/24 8:24 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual . Schedule A/B due 6/10/2024. Schedule D due 6/10/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/10/2024. Schedule G due 6/10/2024. Schedule H due 6/10/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/10/2024. Summary of schedules due 6/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 6/10/2024. Filed by BT Property Investments LLC. (TGR) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2024 (RQC)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAWBApi Meeting of Creditors-Business Chapter 7 - No Asset Fri 05/24 8:24 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting Appointment of Interim Trustee Waldron, Mark D with to be held on 6/25/2024 at 08:30 AM at Telephonic Creditors Meeting Tacoma. (Ramsaur, Tesa)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Deficient Filing Fri 05/24 10:23 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing . (RQC)
Related: [-]
4 4 court 341 Notice Prepare Fri 05/24 10:26 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Sent to BNC for Mailing . (RQC)
Related: [-]