California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-04216
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 2:29 AM PST
Defendant
Curiel Anselmo
Defendant
BMO Bank Corp.
Defendant
Meredith Pike
Plaintiff
Kermit Ty Poulson
1995 Cedar Avenue
Long Beach, CA 90806


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 08/20 11:28 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILING TO FILE A COMPLETE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OR PAY FILING FEE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. To date, Plaintiff has not responded to the Court's Order. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
11 11 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 06/20 3:42 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/05 9:19 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Kermit Poulson re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges4 . (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/05 12:40 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Kermit Poulson re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge6 . (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 06/06 11:59 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Kermit Poulson re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)5 . (iv)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Mail Returned Tue 06/04 3:12 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Kermit Ty Poulson re Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,3 (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 05/24 5:16 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 05/24 5:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 05/24 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 05/24 5:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - (Discovery)1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. No Civil Cover Sheet (CV71). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 05/24 4:59 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kermit Ty Poulson. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 05/24 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, filed by Plaintiff Kermit Ty Poulson. (car)
Related: [-]