California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01041
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 12:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (1)
Represented By
Stephen James Piotrkowski
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Sep 25 2024
JUDGMENT as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP for Time Served, no supervised release imposed, $100 special assessment remitted, and fine waived.. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro (jpp)

Docket last updated: 05/25/2024 2:05 AM PDT
Sunday, April 28, 2024
Arrest of Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya.(gac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/29/2024) (gac). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/29/2024) (gac). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/29/2024) (gac). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/29/2024) (gac). [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya: Initial Appearance set for 4/29/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya held on 4/29/2024. Oral proffer confirmed. Appointed Federal Defenders for Miguel Angel Villa-Raya. Detention Hearing as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya held on 4/29/2024. USA oral motion for detention (Flight); motion granted as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Government. Bond set as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 5/9/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Arraignment set for 5/23/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.) (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos, Alejandro Rodriguez). (CD# 4/29/2024 SBC 24-1:2:34-3:26). (Plaintiff Attorney Elizabet Brown, Joel Doolin AUSA). (Defendant Attorney C. Fenton, B. Eaton, M. Henri FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 5/1/2024 (aje). [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 4/29/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen James Piotrkowski appearing for Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (Piotrkowski, Stephen)Attorney Stephen James Piotrkowski added to party Miguel Angel Villa-Raya(pty:dft) (axi). [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (Piotrkowski, Stephen) (axi). [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
8 8 DETENTION ORDER (Following Contested Hearing) as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 04/30/2024. (ggv) (jmo). [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
7 7 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya. Preliminary Hearing CONTINUED to 5/23/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 5/1/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
11 11 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Rogge, Allison) [3:24-mj-01679-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
12 12 INFORMATION as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (1) count(s) 1. (nbp)
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment on Information as to Miguel Angel Villa-Raya (1) Count 1 held on 5/23/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/3/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (Interpreter Cynthia Herber). (CD# 5/23/2024 SBC 134-148). (Plaintiff Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Emily Child, FD s/a). (dls)
Related: [-]