Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00030
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 24, 2024 9:36 PM HST
Defendant
Glen Taylor (1)
Represented By
Melinda K. Yamaga
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Gary Gurmail Singh
Topa Financial Center
contact info
Sharron I. Rancourt
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lauren M. Nakamura
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/24/2024 11:18 PM HST
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
1 1 SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT AND ARREST WARRANT as to Glen Taylor (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/15/2024. (jni) Modified on 5/16/2024 to unseal document re 5 Order. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
Arrest of Glen Taylor on 5/16/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
3 3 EO: as to Glen Taylor - Initial Appearance is set for 05/17/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Parties have been notified. (Added attorney Melinda K. Yamaga and the Office of the Federal Public Defenders are provisionally appointed pending submission of Defendant's Financial Affidavit form for Glen Taylor.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Unseal Criminal Complaint and Case - by USA as to Glen Taylor. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO UNSEAL CRIMINAL COMPLAINT AND CASE re4 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/16/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain without Bail by USA as to Glen Taylor. (Nakamura, Lauren) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
7 7 EP: INITIAL APPEARANCE held. Defendant is present and in custody. Defendant sworn to the financial affidavit and request for court appointed attorney is granted. Melinda K. Yamaga and the Office of the Federal Public Defenders are appointed. Charges have been received. Defendant understands the charges. Discussion held regarding detention. The Court sets the following hearings: Detention hearing is set for May 22, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Preliminary hearing as to Defendant is set for May 31, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. The Court orders the United States to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Failing to timely do so may result in consequences such as sanctions, adverse jury instructions, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. This order incorporates the provisions of the Court's February 1, 2021 General Order Regarding Rule 5(F). Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Initial Appearance as to Glen Taylor held on 5/17/2024. Detention Hearing is set for 5/22/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Preliminary Hearing is set for 5/31/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. ***Procedural Interval start as to Glen Taylor. ***Location start: LC as to Glen Taylor. (FTR-CT 6 / 11:00 - 11:13) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Glen Taylor. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 in case as to Glen Taylor. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: appearing for Glen Taylor Notice of Change of Counsel; Certificate of Service (Rancourt, Sharron) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
11 11 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER as to Glen Taylor - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/21/2024. Attorney Gary Gurmail Singh added; Attorney Sharron I. Rancourt terminated in case as to Glen Taylor. (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
12 12 EP: DETENTION HEARING held. Defendant is present and in custody. Arguments heard. Court taking judicial notice of the documents on file, the report prepared by the U.S. Probation Office and having considered the comments of counsel, the Court finds that there is no condition or combination of conditions that will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required and the safety of the community. The Court hereby GRANTS 6 Government's Motion to Detain Defendant Without Bail and orders the defendant detained subject to reconsideration at a later date. Government to prepare the Order. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Detention Hearing as to Glen Taylor held on 5/22/2024. Granting 6 Motion to Detain as to Glen Taylor (1) filed by USA. (FTR-CT 6 / 9:48 - 9:53) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (jni) [1:24-mj-00518-KJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Glen Taylor (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4. (eta)
Related: [-]
16 16 EO: as to Glen Taylor - Arraignment and Plea to the Indictment is set for 05/29/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
Related: [-]