South Dakota District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-30032
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Derek McCloskey (1)
Represented By
Katherine Landis-True
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kirk W. Albertson
U.S. Attorney'S Office (pierre, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/25/2024 3:46 AM CDT
Thursday, May 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT and Affidavit as to Derek McCloskey (1). NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (MSB) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Derek McCloskey. Attorney Katherine Landis-True for Derek McCloskey added., Set/Reset Hearings as to Derek McCloskey:( Initial Appearance set for 5/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy.., Remote Video Conference Hearing set for 5/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in Pierre Courtroom 1.) (SF) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Derek McCloskey. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/17/24. (Duffy, Veronica) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy: Initial Appearance as to Derek McCloskey held on 5/17/2024. (Court Reporter: FTR) (JLS) TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence--that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
5 5 Invocation of Rights under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments signed by Derek McCloskey. (Landis-True, Katherine) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit signed by Derek McCloskey. (SF) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
14 14 TEXT ORDER Appointing Federal Public Defender as to Derek McCloskey (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Mark A. Moreno on 5/17/2024. (SF) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
NOTICE of Filing Error:8 Request re Evidence was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Landis-True, Katherine) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
6 6 Preliminary BAIL Report as to Derek McCloskey. In a multi-defendant case, access to this document is restricted to counsel of record for the defendant and government counsel. (mls) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Katherine Landis-True appearing for Derek McCloskey. (Landis-True, Katherine) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
8 8 (FILED IN ERROR) REQUEST for Notice Pursuant to Fed.R.Evid. 404(b), Fed.R.Evid. 609(b), Fed.R.Evid. 807(b) by Derek McCloskey . (Landis-True, Katherine) Modified on 5/21/2024 (DJP). [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
9 9 REQUEST for Notice Pursuant to Fed.R.Evid. 404(b), Fed.R.Evid. 609(b), Fed.R.Evid. 807(b) by Derek McCloskey . (Landis-True, Katherine) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
10 10 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 in case as to Derek McCloskey. (DJP) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
11 11 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as to Derek McCloskey. Suppression Voluntariness Motion due by 6/18/2024. Motions due by 7/9/2024. Plea Agreement due by 7/9/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 02:00 PM in Pierre Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pierre Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 5/20/2024. (DJP) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
12 12 Defendant's CONSENT to Hearing by Video Conference signed by Derek McCloskey. (MSB) [3:24-mj-00038-RAL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
15 15 INDICTMENT (personal identifiers redacted) as to Derek McCloskey (1) count(s) 1. NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (SKK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Charging Document