New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-06018
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 3:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Kervin C. Driscoll (1)
Represented By
Brian Christopher DeCarolis
Law Offices Of Brian Decarolis
contact info
Steven G. Slawinski
Federal Public Defender Western District Of North Carolina
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert Marangola
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Rochester
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/25/2024 5:11 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
1 1 55 pgs COMPLAINT as to Kervin C. Driscoll (1), Terrance J. Jackson (2), Rechelle R. Brooks (3), Jeffrey D. Brownell (4). (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
2 2 1 pgs MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks, Jeffrey D. Brownell. (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Kervin C. Driscoll (1), Terrance J. Jackson (2), Rechelle R. Brooks (3), Jeffrey D. Brownell (4). Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 8/30/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
Arrest of Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks:( Initial Appearance set for 8/31/2023 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen.), Attorney update in case as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks. Attorney Steven G. Slawinski for Kervin C. Driscoll,James L. Riotto, II for Terrance J. Jackson,James P. Vacca for Rechelle R. Brooks added. (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
4 4 55 pgs REDACTED COMPLAINT as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks. (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Initial Appearance as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks held on 8/31/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; James L. Riotto II, Esq.; James P. Vacca, Esq.; Robert Marangola, AUSA; Kristen Nenni, USPO; Sarah Whitcomb, USPO. Defts advised of charges and rights. Defts requests Court appointed counsel. Steven G. Slawinski appointed to represent Kervin C. Driscoll permanently after review of a Financial Affidavit. James L. Riotto II appointed to represent Terrance J. Jackson permanently after review of a Financial Affidavit. James P. Vacca appointed provisionally to represent Rechelle R. Brooks subject to review of a Financial Affidaivt, due to be submitted prior to the next Court appearance. Deft's reserve their rights to a Preliminary Hearing. Govt moves for detention as to all Defts based on risk of flight and danger to the community. Defts request a 1-week adjournment for status to review initial discovery and determine whether to request a Detention Hearing. Order regarding continuing Brady obligation read into the record and acknowledged by the Govt, written order to follow. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 9/7/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 8/31/2023 TO 9/7/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Defts remanded into custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
6 6 2 pgs ORDER Regarding Continuing Brady Obligation as to Kervin C. Driscoll. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 9/1/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kervin C. Driscoll. (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Kervin C. Driscoll held on 9/7/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Robert Marangola, AUSA. The Court will grant the parties a 90-day adjournment and exclusion of time to review discovery and partake in resolution discussions. Requests to adjourn past the scheduled adjourn date will be granted only with a showing of good cause. Requests to adjourn in writing must be submitted no later than 5 business days prior to the scheduled date. Should the parties require the Courts attention within that 90-day period, they may contact Chambers in advance of the scheduled date for assistance or a Court conference date. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 12/7/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 9/7/2023 TO 12/7/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
Case unsealed as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks, Jeffrey D. Brownell (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/31/2023 in case as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Rechelle R. Brooks. (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
22 22 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian Christopher DeCarolis appearing for Kervin C. Driscoll (DeCarolis, Brian) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
CALENDAR EVENT as to Kervin C. Driscoll: Status Conference reset for 12/7/2023 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME .(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
27 27 1 pgs Letter filed by Kervin C. Driscoll (DeCarolis, Brian) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
30 30 1 pgs First MOTION to Adjourn Status Appearance by Kervin C. Driscoll as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks, Jeffrey D. Brownell. (DeCarolis, Brian) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
E-Filing Notification:30 First MOTION to Adjourn Status Appearance by Kervin C. Driscoll as to Kervin C. Driscoll, Terrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks, Jeffrey D. Brownell: Motions filed should only link to the associated Defendant. Motion terminated as to Trerrance J. Jackson, Rechelle R. Brooks, and Jeffrey D. Brownell. No action required. (JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
31 31 TEXT ORDER granting30 Motion to Adjourn Status Conference as to Kervin C. Driscoll (1). The Status Conference shall be adjourned until 1/22/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Time is excluded in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(7)(A) until the adjourn date. I find that the Defendant's and the public's interest in a speedy trial are outweighed by the Defendant's interest in having sufficient time to continue plea negotiations with the Government. Should the parties need additional time to continue resolution discussions, a request must be filed, in writing, no less than 5 business days in advance of the new scheduled date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 12/5/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
37 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Kervin C. Driscoll held on 1/22/2024. Appearances: Brian Christopher DeCarolis, Esq.; Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Robert Marangola, AUSA. The Court notes Mr. DeCarolis has been retained to represent Deft, Mr. Slawinski is relieved as counsel. Parties continuing to review discovery and work towards resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 3/5/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 1/22/2024 TO 3/5/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
45 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Kervin C. Driscoll held on 3/5/2024. Appearances: Brian Christopher DeCarolis, Esq.; Robert Marangola, AUSA. Parties request a 45-day adjournment to continue plea negotiations and schedule a Plea Hearing before a District Judge. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 4/18/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 3/5/2024 TO 4/18/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
48 48 TEXT ORDER as to Kervin C. Driscoll. Plea Hearing set for 4/25/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/27/2024. (DPS) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
53 53 TEXT ORDER as to Kervin C. Driscoll: In light of the scheduled Plea Hearing, the Status Conference before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen shall be adjourned until 4/25/2024 at 12:00 PM. Time will continue to be excluded in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(7)(A) until the adjourn date, for the reasons stated in open Court on 3/5/2024 (ECF 45 Minute Entry). This conference will be adjourned should the Plea Hearing take place, the Defendant plead guilty, and the District Judge accept the plea of guilty. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 4/17/2024.(JB) [6:23-mj-00619-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
54 54 1 pgs INFORMATION TO ESTABLISH PRIOR CONVICTION as to Kervin C. Driscoll. (DMK)
Related: [-]
55 55 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Kervin C. Driscoll. (DMK)
Related: [-]
56 56 3 pgs INFORMATION as to Kervin C. Driscoll (1) count(s) 1, 2. (DMK)
Related: [-]
57 57 13 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kervin C. Driscoll. (DMK)
Related: [-]
58 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford: Appearances: Robert Marangola, AUSA; Brian C. DeCarolis, Esq. with defendant. Plea Hearing as to Kervin C. Driscoll held on 4/25/2024. Defendant sworn, advised of rights. Court addresses Government's intent to file Information pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 851; defendant admits to prior conviction. Defendant waives indictment and agrees to filing of 2-count Information. Plea agreement executed. Court accepts the plea. Plea entered by Kervin C. Driscoll (1) Guilty Counts 1,2. PROBATION NOTIFIED OF PLEA. Sentencing set for 8/20/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. (Court Reporter Karen Clark.) (DPS)
Related: [-]