California Central District Court
Case #: 8:24-cr-00052
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2024 12:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu (2)
Represented By
Robert H Rexrode, III
Law Offices Of Robert H. Rexrode
contact info
Michael Alex Schachter
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Kamen Zdravkov Kostov (1)
Represented By
Shannon M. Coit
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Kenneth A Reed
Law Offices Of Kenneth A Reed
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
K. Afia Bondero
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Stephanie L. Orrick
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/12/2025 12:42 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
1 1 30+ pgs COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu in violation of 18:1029(a)(3). Approved by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott as to Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu (1). (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 1 pgs REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu; defendants Year of Birth: 1998; date of arrest: 4/16/2024 USMS# REG 09994-511 (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE - Complaint & Warrant held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu. Attorney Michael Alex Schachter (present). Romanian Interpreter not available. Initial Appearance is continued to 4/17/2024 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Defendant is ordered Temporarily Detained. Defendant committed to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court Smart: CS 4/16/24. (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu. Pending hearing, the defendant shall be held in custody by the U. S. Marshal and produced for the hearing. Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing set for 4/17/2024 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/16/24 as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu. (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
9 9 1 pgs MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Michael Alex Schachter for Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu, Deputy Federal Public Defender, appointed; Special Appearance made by attorney Amy Karlin. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/1/2024 02:00 PM before Duty Magistrate Judge in Santa Ana. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 5/6/2024 10:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge in Santa Ana. (ROMANIAN) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu Court Smart: CS 4/17/24. (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu. (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 5/1/24 at 2:00 PM in Santa Ana and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 5/6/24 at 10:00 AM in Santa Ana before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [8:24-mj-00167-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
1 1 22 pgs COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov in violation of 18:1029(a)(4). Approved by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Kamen Zdravkov Kostov (1). (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
2 2 1 pgs REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov; defendants Year of Birth: 1974; date of arrest: 4/18/2024 USMS# REG 12690-506 (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Shannon M. Coit for Kamen Zdravkov Kostov, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Governments request for detention is GRANTED without prejudice. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/6/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge in Santa Ana. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 5/13/2024 08:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge in Santa Ana. (BULGARIAN) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov Court Smart: ECRO CS 4/22/24. (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov. (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 5/6/24 at 11:30 AM and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 5/13/24 at 8:30 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
9 9 3 pgs EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Appointing CJA Counsel Filed by Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov. (Coit, Shannon) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
10 10 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL as to Kamen Zdravkov Kostov (1) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Federal Public Defenders Ex Parte Application to appoint replacement counsel from the CJA panel for Kamen Zdravkov Kostov is GRANTED. The Court hereby appoints Kenneth A. Reed from the Southern Division CJA indigent defense panel to represent Kamen Zdravkov Kostov. re9 (mba) [8:24-mj-00178-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
14 14 17 pgs INDICTMENT Filed as to Kamen Zdravkov Kostov (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, 6, 7, 10, 11, Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu (2) count(s) 1, 2-5, 6, 7, 8-9. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA K Afia Bondero as to Defendant Kamen Zdravkov Kostov; defendants Year of Birth: 1974 USMS# REG 12690-506 (mhe)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA K Afia Bondero as to Defendant Andrei Alexandru Dorobantu; defendants Year of Birth: 1998 (mhe)
Related: [-]