New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-07012
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
EDDIE HUTCHINSON (1)
Represented By
JOHN B. BRENNAN
Law Offices Of John B. Brennan
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
KRISTEN M. HARBERG
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
ANDREW B. JOHNS
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/27/2024 3:30 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to EDDIE HUTCHINSON (1). (bda)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to EDDIE HUTCHINSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/27/2024. (bda)
Related: [-]