Original Case: 2:24-cv-00274

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01935
Typecivil / united states as party / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 20, 2024 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE ROBERT J. COLVILLE
Represented By
Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUSTIN JUAN DE LA CRUZ MARTINEZ
Represented By
Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez
contact info

GPO Sep 19 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: JORDAN, PHIPPS and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 5.

Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 6:03 AM EDT
Friday, May 24, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Justin Juan De La Cruz Martinez in District Court No. 2-24-cv-00274. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Judgement 050324
Att: 3 6 pgs District Court Opinion and Order 050324
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR)
Related: [-]