New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:24-cv-04049
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332t Diversity-Torts
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 5:09 AM EST
Defendant
Fox Rehabilitation Services, P.C., NJ
Defendant
Fox Rehabilitation, Occupational and Speech Therapy Services, LLC, NJ
Represented By
Carl D. Weinberg
Schiavetti Corgan Diedwards Weinberg & Nicholson LLP
contact info
Tara Di Luca
Schiavetti, Corgan, Diedwards, Weinbegr & Nicholson, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stefanie Garner
Represented By
Carl D. Weinberg
Schiavetti Corgan Diedwards Weinberg & Nicholson LLP
contact info
Tara Di Luca
Schiavetti, Corgan, Diedwards, Weinbegr & Nicholson, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Beth Carolyn Kevles
Represented By
Joshua M Blane
Gray Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan David Kevles
Represented By
Joshua M Blane
Gray Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
52 52 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/21 3:09 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:51 Letter filed by Beth Carolyn Kevles, Jonathan David Kevles. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Court adopts the discovery schedule proposed above. Additionally, the post-fact-discovery conference previously scheduled for May 9, 2025 is hereby adjourned to August 8, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 10/24/2025., Telephone Conference set for 8/8/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/21/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
51 51 misc Letter Fri 04/18 2:11 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Josh Blane (Attorney for Plaintiff) dated 04/18/2025 re: Joint Discovery Letter. Document filed by Beth Carolyn Kevles, Jonathan David Kevles..(Blane, Joshua)
Related: [-]