Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-01112

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00183
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S Bank, N.A.
8201 Peters Road, Suite 3000
Plantation, FL 33324
Represented By
U.S Bank, N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen L Meininger
Cornerstone Law Firm, PLLC Andrew S. Ballentine, Esq. 1511 E. State Road 434, Suite 3049
Winter Springs, FL 32708
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
court Compromise Cross-Reference Wed 04/16 1:45 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:24-bk-01112-CPM, Doc. 43 . (Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
15 15 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 03/21 9:36 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Second Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen L Meininger Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 order Reschedule Hearing Thu 03/20 8:35 AM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 13
court Compromise Cross-Reference Mon 03/24 11:32 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:24-bk-01112-CPM, Doc. No. 40 . (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Wed 03/19 7:09 AM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On March 24, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen L Meininger. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 misc Proof of Service (BK) Tue 10/29 7:31 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen L Meininger Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 order Reschedule Hearing Mon 10/28 2:51 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Juan)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Mon 10/28 7:26 AM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On November 4, 2024 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen L Meininger. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 08/03 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
8 8 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 07/31 12:34 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 1 ,7
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 3:27 PM
Answer to Complaint U.S. Bank N.A.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Crystal B Carswell on behalf of Defendant U.S Bank, N.A.. (Carswell, Crystal)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service (AP) Mon 07/15 12:55 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Agreed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to an Adversary Complaint Filed by Crystal B Carswell on behalf of Defendant U.S Bank, N.A. Related [+]. (Carswell, Crystal)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
5 5 order Extend Time Wed 07/03 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint until July 26, 2024 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Crystal Carswell is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
4 4 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Tue 07/02 5:12 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Filed by Crystal B Carswell on behalf of Defendant U.S Bank, N.A. Related [+]. (Carswell, Crystal)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 06/11 1:34 PM
Service Executed on U.S Bank of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen L Meininger. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 06/04 11:56 AM
Summons issued on U.S Bank, N.A. along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 07/04/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 05/28 12:23 PM
Complaint by Stephen L Meininger against U.S Bank, N.A.. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet