Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:24-cv-11404
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
18 18 misc Copy Mailed Thu 11/21 11:54 AM
Copy re17 Order Dismissing Case,16 Memorandum & ORDER mailed to Heewon Lee on 11/21/2024. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/20 4:53 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 11/20 4:47 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ONDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. For the foregoing reasons, defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 12 ) is GRANTED. So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
15 15 respoth Response - not related to a motion Thu 10/03 10:49 AM
Response by Commissioner of SSA to14 Amended Complaint .(Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - February 6, 2024, Notice of Change in Payment
Friday, September 20, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/20 3:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA, filed by Donhee Jung, Heewon Lee.. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Affidavit
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 09/05 11:41 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Salem Social Security Office. (Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 09/05 11:36 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted by Salem Social Security Office.(Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/30 9:57 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to September 12, 2024, to to file a response to the plaintiffs' amended complaint. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/29 2:19 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to September 12, 2024, to to file a response to the plaintiffs' amended complaint by Salem Social Security Office.(Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/03 2:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Salem Social Security Office, filed by Donhee Jung, Heewon Lee.. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Friday, June 07, 2024
8 8 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Fri 06/07 10:41 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
7 7 notice Notice - Other Thu 06/06 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Salem Social Security Office that the Agency has Obtained an Address for Plaintiff Donhee Jung (Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other Thu 06/06 1:34 PM
NOTICE by Salem Social Security Office that it has Filed the State Court Record(Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Record
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 order Procedural Order re Social Security Action Wed 05/29 1:30 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action The court transmits this action to the Commissioner of the appropriate office within the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney for this district, through this NEF, under Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Wed 05/29 11:20 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases Wed 05/29 11:00 AM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 05/28 5:41 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/28 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Salem Social Security Office ( Fee Status: US Government)(Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Small Claim