California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Case #: 2:24-cv-01499
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:59 AM PST
Defendant
Steel River Systems, LLC
Represented By
June Dittus Coleman
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Jones
Represented By
Matthew M. Loker
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
Charles Brier Cummins
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Terminated: 10/18/2024
Represented By
Kyle Pietrzak
Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.
contact info

GPO Sep 13 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 09/12/2024 SETTING the Scheduling Conference for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The conference will be conducted remotely via Zoom. (Nair, C)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 18, 2024
23 23 order Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 10/18 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/18/2024: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.18 , Defendant Trans Union, LLC is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/18 11:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/18/2024: In light of the 21 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, the14 10/24/2024 initial scheduling conference previously set before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is VACATED. (Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Fri 10/18 10:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-01499 TLN JDP. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 10:05 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles Brier Cummins on behalf of Jennifer Jones. Attorney Cummins, Charles Brier added. (Cummins, Charles)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 10/18 8:35 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coleman, June)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/17 2:06 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Trans Union LLC by Jennifer Jones. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 14, 2024
17 17 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 10/14 9:21 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
16 16 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/11 9:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/11/2024: In light of the13 Notice of Settlement, dispositional documents shall be due by 10/22/2024. (Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Scheduling Report Fri 10/11 7:31 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Jennifer Jones. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 09/13 8:08 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 09/12/2024 SETTING the Scheduling Conference for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The conference will be conducted remotely via Zoom. (Nair, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 08/23 1:21 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT with Trans Union LLC by Jennifer Jones. Dispositional Docs due by 9/16/2024. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/07 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Steel River Systems, LLC. (Coleman, June)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/07 5:23 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Steel River Systems, LLC. (Coleman, June)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 07/03 7:49 AM
STIPULATION STIPULATION FOR EXTESION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Steel River Systems, LLC. Attorney Coleman, June Dittus added. (Coleman, June)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/20 9:42 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Trans Union, LLC served on 5/31/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/20 9:42 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/20 9:40 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steel River Systems, LLC served on 5/31/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (Wagner, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 8:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/20 8:53 AM
ANSWER by Trans Union, LLC. Attorney Pietrzak, Kyle added.(Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 06/07 9:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 05/28 1:46 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 05/28 1:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Steel River Systems, LLC, Trans Union, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew M. Loker* *Loker Law, APC* *1303 East Grand Ave., Suite 101* *Arroyo Grande, CA 93420*. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/28 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Steel River Systems, LLC, Trans Union, LLC by Jennifer Jones. Attorney Loker, Matthew M. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11547569)(Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet