California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-01131
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:08 AM PST
Defendant
C & J Clark Retail, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mackensie Biddle
Represented By
Helene Marie Mayer
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info
Joanna Ghosh
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info
Arby Aiwazian
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Evengeline D. Gaston
Represented By
Vedang Jasmatbhai Patel
Bibiyan Law Group, PC
contact info
Helene Marie Mayer
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info
Brandon Chang
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info
Joanna Ghosh
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info
Arby Aiwazian
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessa Naluz
Represented By
Helene Marie Mayer
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info
Joanna Ghosh
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info
Arby Aiwazian
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/22 10:48 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that the Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [ECF No. 24] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set on April 25, 2025. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
25 25 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 03/18 3:40 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that the Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [ECF No.22 is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set on March 21, 2025. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
24 24 motion Settlement Mon 03/17 4:33 PM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by PLAINTIFFS Mackensie Biddle, Jessa Naluz. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 2 Corrected Declaration of Helene Mayer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 3 Corrected Declaration of David D. Bibiyan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 4 Corrected Declaration of Mackensie Biddle in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 5 Corrected Declaration of Jessa Naluz in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 6 Corrected Declaration of Evangeline D. Gaston in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval,
Att: 8 Proof of Service
Monday, February 03, 2025
23 23 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Mon 02/03 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Helene Marie Mayer counsel for Plaintiffs Mackensie Biddle, Jessa Naluz. Changing ADDRESS to 450 North Brand Blvd., Suite 900, Glendale, CA 91203. Filed by Plaintiffs Mackensie Biddle, Jessa Naluz. (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
22 22 motion Settlement Thu 01/02 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by PLAINTIFFS Mackensie Biddle, Jessa Naluz. Motion set for hearing on 3/21/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Helene Mayer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mackensie Biddle in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jessa Naluz in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 4 Declaration of Evangeline D. Gaston in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 5 Declaration of David D. Bibiyan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
21 21 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 11/26 10:59 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received Plaintiff's Declaration [ECF No. 20], filed in response to the Courts OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution [ECF No. 18]. The Court accepts the response and hereby orders the OSC DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
20 20 misc Response Mon 11/25 3:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Mackensie Biddle, Jessa Naluz to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,18 Declaration of Helene Mayer in Response to Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal Re Failure to Prosecute (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
19 19 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Fri 11/22 11:54 AM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mackensie Biddle, Evengeline D. Gaston, Jessa Naluz, upon Defendant C & J Clark Retail, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Donald Sullivan, Attorney. (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/18 5:05 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal forLack of Prosecution by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before November 25, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not been served, for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78ed of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a proof of service of the summons and complaint. If the deadline to Answer has already passed) plaintiff(s) must also file a Request for Default or Stipulation Extending Time to Answer. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
17 17 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 09/16 10:31 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received Plaintiff's Declaration [ECF No. 16], filed in response to the Courts OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution [ECF No. 15]. The Court accepts the response and hereby orders the OSC DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
16 16 misc Declaration Fri 09/13 1:58 PM
DECLARATION of Helene Mayer re Order to Show Cause,15 Declaration of Helene Mayer in Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Re: Failure to Prosecute filed by Plaintiffs Evengeline D. Gaston, Jessa Naluz. (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 09/04 10:52 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before 9/13/2024, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not been served, for lack of prosecution. See document for further details. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 07/22 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vedang Jasmatbhai Patel counsel for Plaintiff Evengeline D. Gaston. Adding Brandon M. Chang as counsel of record for Evangeline D. Gaston for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Evangeline D. Gaston. (Patel, Vedang)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 07/22 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vedang Jasmatbhai Patel counsel for Plaintiff Evengeline D. Gaston. Adding Vedang J. Patel as counsel of record for Evangeline D. Gaston for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Evangeline D. Gaston. (Attorney Vedang Jasmatbhai Patel added to party Evengeline D. Gaston(pty:pla))(Patel, Vedang)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/11 8:32 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
11 11 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Mon 06/10 3:38 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01624 JWH(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-01131 JWH(ADSx). Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 06/04 11:43 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant C & J Clark Retail, Inc.. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
9 9 notice Summons Request Mon 06/03 10:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Mackensie Biddle, Evengeline D. Gaston, Jessa Naluz. (Ghosh, Joanna)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Summons Mon 06/03 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request7 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
7 7 notice Summons Request Fri 05/31 5:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Mackensie Biddle, Evengeline D. Gaston, Jessa Naluz. (Ghosh, Joanna)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Summons Fri 05/31 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Requests was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events > Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 05/30 6:01 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 05/30 6:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 05/30 6:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
2 2 notice Related Case(s) Tue 05/28 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Mackensie Biddle, Evengeline D. Gaston, Jessa Naluz. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01624-JWH-ADS (Mayer, Helene)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/28 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37544878 - Fee: $405, filed by PlaintiffS Mackensie Biddle, Evengeline D. Gaston, Jessa Naluz. (Attorney Joanna Ghosh added to party Mackensie Biddle(pty:pla), Attorney Joanna Ghosh added to party Evengeline D. Gaston(pty:pla), Attorney Joanna Ghosh added to party Jessa Naluz (pty:pla))(Ghosh, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons