Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 2:24-cv-00736
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:24 AM PST
Defendant
Choice Screening Inc
Represented By
William J Simmons
Littler Mendelson Pc (pa)
contact info
Derek Allan Bishop
Littler Mendelson Pc (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Johnson, Jr
Represented By
Dawn M McCraw
Consumer Attorneys Plc (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/04 2:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation20 is GRANTED.The above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, as to Choice Screening, Inc. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation Tue 12/03 2:20 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties(McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/29 3:07 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/17 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Choice Screening, Inc. by Plaintiff Larry Johnson, Jr (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 order JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM) Tue 09/10 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *4-6 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/12/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 10/24/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/2/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/1/2025, Motions due by 7/31/2025, Discovery completed by 9/2/2025, Dispositive motions due by 9/29/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/13/2025, Motions in Limine due by 12/1/2025, Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2025, Deposition Designations due by 12/24/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/5/2026, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/5/2026. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
16 16 17 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 08/22 8:52 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
15 15 motion Protective Order Wed 08/21 2:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Larry Johnson, Jr.(McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 misc Joint Status Report Wed 08/21 1:51 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-6. (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/23 1:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Choice Screening Inc.(Bishop, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 07/17 4:02 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/31/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/14/2024. (AD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
11 11 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/03 12:43 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William J Simmons for DEFENDANT Choice Screening Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/03 10:38 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William J. Simmons FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Choice Screening Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8531209 (Bishop, Derek)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 10:32 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Choice Screening Inc. (Bishop, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/01 9:45 AM
ORDER granting Parties'7 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading . Defendant Choice Screening is ordered to file its responsive pleading on or before 7/23/2024. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 06/28 3:44 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading , filed by Defendant Choice Screening Inc. Noting Date 6/28/2024, (Bishop, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/28 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Derek Allan Bishop on behalf of Defendant Choice Screening Inc. (Bishop, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/12 9:01 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Choice Screening Inc on 6/11/2024 (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
4 4 misc Jury Demand Wed 05/29 10:38 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Larry Johnson, Jr (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/29 10:03 AM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to Defendant Choice Screening Inc (KS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 05/29 9:44 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/29 9:39 AM
Judge James L. Robart added. (KS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/28 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Choice Screening, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Dawn M McCraw added to party Larry Johnson Jr. (pty:pla) filed by Larry Johnson Jr..(McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8483177
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons