Colorado District Court
Judge:Susan Prose
Case #: 1:24-cv-01501
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 3:00 AM MST
Defendant
DISH Purchasing Corporation
Defendant
DISH Wireless LLC
Plaintiff
Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Ethan Elliott Zweig
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
David Allen Belsheim
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 09/03 10:30 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 9/3/2024, granting11 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs. The case is closed. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 08/16 3:27 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.. (Zweig, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Fri 08/02 2:41 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants DISH Purchasing Corporation, DISH Wireless LLC. DISH Purchasing Corporation answer due 8/9/2024; DISH Wireless LLC answer due 8/9/2024. (Belsheim, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/11 3:31 PM
Order Setting Consent Deadline and Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 7/11/2024. If the parties have not done so already, they shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form on or before August 26, 2024 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on September 9, 2024, at TIME AM/PM. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. The parties shall file the proposed Scheduling Order with the Clerk's Office, and in accordance with District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") Procedures, no later than five business days prior to the scheduling conference. The parties shall also email the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format to Magistrate Judge Prose at [LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] . by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 7/11/2024. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Mon 07/01 9:53 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 7/1/2024, denying without prejudice the7 Motion for Leave to Restrict the exhibits to the complaint. The exhibits to the complaint are contractual documents between Plaintiff and Defendants. Plaintiff asserts these documents contain confidential business information or trade secrets and that redaction would be unsuitable. The parties agreed therein (Paragraph 8.1 of the contract at ECF 2) that the entire contract was confidential and proprietary. However, the general presumption of public access applies with particular strength to civil complaints. Courthouse News Serv. v. N.M. Admin. Off. of Cts ., 53 F.4th 1245, 1265 (10th Cir. 2022). Much of the contract and statements of work consist of terms that do not appear proprietary or confidential. The court accordingly denies the motion to restrict with leave to refile (by August 30, 2024) after Plaintiff confers with Defendants to propose public, redacted versions of these documents or to support the motion to restrict with more detail concerning why all provisions of these documents should be restricted. The exhibits shall remain Level 1 restricted until the court rules, assuming a motion to restrict is timely refiled. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
7 7 motion Leave to Restrict Mon 06/10 10:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.. (Zweig, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 06/04 11:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.. DISH Purchasing Corporation waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; DISH Wireless LLC waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (Zweig, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 05/30 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Allen Belsheim on behalf of Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.Attorney David Allen Belsheim added to party Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla) (Belsheim, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
4 4 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 05/29 9:19 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (ykare, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 05/29 9:18 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (ykare, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Tue 05/28 4:46 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit 1 to Complaint by Plaintiff Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc...(Zweig, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/28 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against DISH Purchasing Corporation, DISH Wireless LLC dba BOOST Mobile and/or Boost Infinite (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9706122)Attorney Ethan Elliott Zweig added to party Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Russell Westbrook Enterprises, Inc..(Zweig, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet