New York Northern District Court
Judge:Glenn T Suddaby
Referred: Mitchell J Katz
Case #: 5:24-cv-00709
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 4:32 AM EST
Defendant
TGI Friday's New York LLC
Represented By
Michele Cattano
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Brecher
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Brian A. Bodansky
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
TGI Fridays, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Cattano
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Brecher
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Brian A. Bodansky
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Daughtry
Represented By
Frank S. Gattuso
Gattuso & Ciotoli, PLLC
contact info
James E. Murphy
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Michele A. Moreno
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittany Lopergalo
Represented By
Frank S. Gattuso
Gattuso & Ciotoli, PLLC
contact info
James E. Murphy
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Michele A. Moreno
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Natasha Sellin
Represented By
Frank S. Gattuso
Gattuso & Ciotoli, PLLC
contact info
James E. Murphy
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Michele A. Moreno
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Mon 11/25 7:24 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to TGI Friday's NY, LLC, TGIF Holdings, LLC, TGIF Midco, Inc., TGIF Parent, Inc., TGI Friday's Inc., Burlington Towne Crossing, Inc., T G I Friday's of Greenbelt, Inc., T G I Friday's of Towson, Inc., T G I Friday's of Wisconsin, Inc., T.G.I. Friday's Marketing Advisory Council, T.G.I. Friday's of Charles County, Inc., T.G.I. Friday's of Frederick County, Inc., T.G.I. Friday's of Harford County, Inc., T.G.I. Friday's of Washington County, Inc., TGI Friday's of Annapolis, Inc., TGI Friday's of Howard County, Inc., TGI Friday's of Rockville, Inc., TGI Friday's of Texas LLC, TGI Friday's of the Rockies, Inc., TGIF/DFW Manager, LLC, TGIF/DFW Partner, LLC, TGIF/JDC Restaurant Development, LLC, and WEBCO Products Incorporated by TGI Fridays, Inc., TGI Friday's New York LLC. (Simkin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
18 18 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/11 4:41 PM
TEXT ORDER : Based upon the17 Stipulation of Dismissal, the Clerk is directed to close this action. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 9/11/2024. (sal )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/10 11:06 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin submitted to Judge Hon. Glenn T Suddaby. (Gattuso, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
16 16 order Order on Letter Request Fri 08/09 3:25 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's #15 Letter Request for an extension of time to file Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion is due by 9/11/2024. Reply to Response to Motion is due by 9/18/2024. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 8/9/2024. (kee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
15 15 motion Letter Request/Motion Thu 08/08 1:23 PM
Letter Motion from Frank S. Gattuso, Esq. for Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin requesting an extension to file Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss submitted to Judge Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby . (Gattuso, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/24 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele Cattano on behalf of TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Cattano, Michele)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 07/23 11:16 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY RE:12 Memorandum of Law: Docket entry modified by Clerk to link Memorandum of Law to the #11 Motion to Dismiss. (kck)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
13 13 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 07/22 4:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 8/22/2024 and the 8/15/2024 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the11 Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 7/22/2024. (ztc)
Related: [-]
12 12 20 pgs respm Memorandum of Law Mon 07/22 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re1 Complaint, filed by TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc.. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 07/22 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by TGI Fridays, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 8/12/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/19/2024 (Brecher, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/17 11:08 AM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants TGI Friday's New York LLC and TGI Fridays, Inc. to file an answer or otherwise move on or before 7/22/2024. (ztc)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/17 8:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2024 Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Stipulation Extending Time
Friday, June 14, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/14 12:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Minard Carkner on May 30, 2024, filed by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin. (Gattuso, Frank)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 06/14 1:32 PM
*** Answer due date set for TGI Fridays, Inc. and TGI Friday's New York LLC. Answers due 6/20/2024. (kck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Brecher on behalf of TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Bodansky on behalf of TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Bodansky, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice - Other Thu 06/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin Consent to Join by Natasha Sellin (Files, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice - Other Thu 06/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin Consent to Join by Jennifer Daughtry (Files, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 05/28 11:38 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/15/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ham)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/28 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to TGI Fridays, Inc.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued for TGI Friday's New York LLC
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/28 11:32 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6744292) filed by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet