Montana District Court
Judge:Donald W Molloy
Case #: 9:24-cv-00073
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Terminated:May 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 2:35 AM MST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Ben D. Kappelman
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyler Hobbs
Represented By
Amanda Beckers Sowden
Gannett Sowden Law, PLLC
contact info
Ward E. Taleff
Resolute Law PLLC
contact info
Zachary M. Krumm
contact info
Timothy B. Strauch
Resolute Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alyssa Hobbs
Represented By
Amanda Beckers Sowden
Gannett Sowden Law, PLLC
contact info
Ward E. Taleff
Resolute Law PLLC
contact info
Zachary M. Krumm
contact info
Timothy B. Strauch
Resolute Law PLLC
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2024
ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Wells Fargo must answer the Amended Complaint or once again move to dismiss by the deadline provided for in Rule 12(a). No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/3/2024. (NOS)
GPO Dec 23 2024
OPINION and ORDER re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/23/2024. (APP)
GPO May 21 2025
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/21/2025. (NOS)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/21 1:57 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/21/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/21 9:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order Setting - MT 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM Mon 05/05 3:48 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The jury trial set for December 15, 2025, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/5/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
40 40 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/02 2:56 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Settlement Conference held on 5/2/2025. This case has settled. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
39 39 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/24 4:00 PM
ANSWER to36 Second Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Kappelman, Ben) (Modified to link to 2nd Amended Complaint.) (NOS)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Order Setting - MT Order Vacating - MT Thu 04/24 1:31 PM
TEXT Order Re-Setting Settlement Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Settlement Conference is reset for 5/2/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The Settlement Conference will be conducted by Zoom. The Court is responsible to conduct the settlement conference by Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/24/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
37 37 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Thu 04/10 2:50 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. Amended Preliminary Pretrial Statement . (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
36 36 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/10 2:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Plaintiffs, filed by Tyler Hobbs, Alyssa Hobbs. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
35 35 order Scheduling Order - SDM Thu 03/27 10:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2025. Motions due by 11/10/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/26/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2025 at 2:30 p.m. in Missoula, Montana. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2025 at 9:00 a.m. at the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, Montana. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/26/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
34 34 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM Thu 03/27 10:40 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings before Judge Donald W. Molloy: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/26/2025. (Law Clerk S. Stephens) (Hearing held in Missoula) (NOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
33 33 3 pgs order Order Setting - MT Tue 03/18 11:10 AM
Order Setting: Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/18/2025. *See Order for Full Details* (SAJ)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/18 10:38 AM
***Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on March 18, 2025. Settlement Conference will be held on May 8, 2025. Further order to follow. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
32 32 order Order Setting - MT Mon 03/17 12:54 PM
TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The call-in number is as follows: 833-990-9400; Meeting ID: 882927420. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/17/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/17 12:14 PM
ORDER granting30 Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference. This matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge John Johnston for the limited purpose of conducting a formal settlement conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the March 26, 2025 pretrial conference remains set as scheduled. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/17/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
30 30 motion Settlement Conference - MT Fri 03/14 11:18 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference TO REFER CASE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE . Ben D. Kappelman appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
29 29 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Tue 03/04 4:27 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. (Krumm, Zachary)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Tue 03/04 3:55 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
27 27 misc Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT Mon 02/17 11:07 AM
STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. (Krumm, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Setting - MT Fri 01/24 5:58 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently set for March 11, 2025, is VACATED and RESET for March 26, 2025, at 3:00 p.m. at the Alexander Blewett III School of Law, Room 219, in Missoula, Montana. The Court's Order dated December 26, 2024, (Doc.20 ), shall remain in full force and affect in all other respects. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/24/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation Thu 01/23 9:51 AM
STIPULATION re Confidentiality by Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Thu 01/23 9:50 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 01/06 3:59 PM
Wells Fargo's ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint & Jury Demand by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Setting - MT 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/30 7:43 AM
ORDER granting21 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference now set for February 20, 2025, is VACATED and RESET for March 11, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, Montana. Joint Discovery Plan, Preliminary Pretrial Statements, and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by March 4, 2025. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/30/2024. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
21 21 motion Continue Fri 12/27 11:30 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference . Timothy B. Strauch appearing for Plaintiffs Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Thursday, December 26, 2024
20 20 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Thu 12/26 3:50 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/13/2025. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/13/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/13/2025. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2025 at 10:30 a.m. in the Russell Smith Courthouse in Missoula, Montana. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/26/2024. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 24 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/23 1:12 PM
OPINION and ORDER re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/23/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/15 5:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/01 5:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Alyssa Hobbs, Tyler Hobbs. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
16 16 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 09/13 10:27 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/13 10:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint . Ben D. Kappelman appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 09/03 4:04 PM
ORDER denying as moot7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Wells Fargo must answer the Amended Complaint or once again move to dismiss by the deadline provided for in Rule 12(a). No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/3/2024. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Motion Fri 08/30 4:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (suggestion of mootness) filed by Hobbs Alyssa, Tyler Hobbs. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/30 4:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Tyler Hobbs, Hobbs Alyssa. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/29 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Krumm on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Krumm, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/12 3:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 08/12 3:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - March 2022 Rate Lock Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 2022 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 2022 Commitment Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - May 2023 Rate Lock Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - June 2023 Lock Expiration Notice
8 8 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Mon 08/12 3:07 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/12 3:06 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Ben D. Kappelman appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/29 11:47 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant must answer the pending complaint on or before August 12, 2024. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/29/2024. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/25 4:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint . Ben D. Kappelman appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kappelman, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed - SDM Thu 06/27 12:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tyler Hobbs, Hobbs Alyssa. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 5/29/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/28 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (NOS)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Tue 05/28 8:47 AM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to All Plaintiffs, re1 Complaint (Strauch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 05/28 8:26 AM
COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Tyler Hobbs, Hobbs Alyssa. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/28 8:28 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3268328 (TAG)
Related: [-]