California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-04434
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:15 AM PST
Defendant
Natalia Tsagolova
Plaintiff
Vitaly Ivanovich Smagin
Represented By
Nicholas O'Brian Kennedy
Baker And Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Barry J. Thompson
Baker And Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Byron Roan Tuyay
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Thomas A. D. Tysowsky
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 06/12 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Vitaly Ivanovich Smagin. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/03 1:10 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
10 10 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Mon 06/03 12:13 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:14-cv-09764 RGK(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04434 RGK(MAAx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/29 1:17 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Natalia Tsagolova. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 05/29 1:07 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/29 1:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/29 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Tue 05/28 10:26 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-09764-RGK (PLAx); 2:17-cv-06126-R (PLAx); 2:20-cv-02925-TJH-MAA and 2:20-cv-11236-RGK-MAA (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/28 10:22 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN, identifying VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN, Plaintiff, and NATALIA TSAGOLOVA, Defendant. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 05/28 10:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,1 filed by Plaintiff VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 05/28 10:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/28 10:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37548180 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN. (Attorney Nicholas O'Brian Kennedy added to party VITALY IVANOVICH SMAGIN(pty:pla))(Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-USDC Judgment 3.31.2016,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-London Award 11.11.2014,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Liechtenstein Order 2.24.2016 Eng&German,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Liechtenstein Order 10.29.2016 Eng&German,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Liechtenstein Order 3.02.2020 Eng&German,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Liechtenstein Order 9.15.2020 Eng&German,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-Liechtenstein Order 10.28.2020 Eng&German,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-Liechtenstein Const 6.29.2021 Eng&German,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-Part 1-Moscow Sentence 5.31.2018-Eng,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9-Part 2-Moscow Sentence 5.31.2018-Russian,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10-Kerimov Settlmt Transmittal 5.26.2015,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11-Decl of Trust 5.27.2015,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12-Order Re FAC 11.30.2023,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13-LASupCt-Tsagolova Decl 10.09.2014,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14- TPO Order 12.23.2014,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15- Stipulation Re Stay 2.03.2015,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16-Order Re Expanded Pl 9.28.2015,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17-Order Re Post Judgment Inj 11.14.2016,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18-Order Re Turnover Mtn 9.20.2017,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19-Order Re Mtn to Clarify 4.01.2020,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20-Order Re Contempt 7.09.2020,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21-Order Granting Mtn for Contempt Dkt. 315 9.16.2020,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22-Stmt of Partial Compliance 9.23.2023,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23-Med Report 8.25.2020,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24-Suppl Med Report 9.24.2020,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25-Instrument Re Share Transfer 10.30.2020,
Att: 27 Exhibit 26-Savannah Shareholder Resolution 11.18.2020,
Att: 28 Exhibit 27-Power Transfer Ntc 9.23.2020,
Att: 29 Exhibit 28-Trustee Removal Inst 10.28.2020,
Att: 30 Exhibit 29-S. Egiazaryan Report 8.04.2020,
Att: 31 Exhibit 30-Liechtenstein Order 8.21.2020 Eng&Germ,
Att: 32 Exhibit 31-E. Novichikhin Witness Stmt Eng&Germ,
Att: 33 Exhibit 32-LASupCt Memo Re Bifurcation 8.14.2023,
Att: 34 Exhibit 33-Conclusions 2-3.16.2023 French,
Att: 35 Exhibit 34-Monaco Order 1.20.2023,
Att: 36 Exhibit 35-Monaco Order 6.01.2023 Eng& French,
Att: 37 Exhibit 36-Liechtenstein Order 9.12.2022 Eng&Germ,
Att: 38 Exhibit 37-Monaco Court of Appeal Order 12.14.2023 Engl&German,
Att: 39 Exhibit 38-Order Re Mtn for OSC 9.1.2023,
Att: 40 Exhibit 39-Order Re Contempt Mtn 5.22.2023,
Att: 41 Exhibit 40-E. Novichikhin Decl 1.02.2024,
Att: 42 Exhibit 41-Contempt Order 7.09.2020