California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:24-cv-00620
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 1:28 AM PST
Defendant
Quten Research Institute, LLC
Represented By
Tia Nguyen
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Keara M. Gordon, PHV
contact info
William W. Reichart, PHV
contact info
Isabelle Louise Ord
Dla Piper, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Swetala
Represented By
Ronald Marron
Law Offices Of Ronald A. Marron
contact info
Kas L. Gallucci
Law Offices Of Ronald A. Marron
contact info
Lilach Halperin Klein
Crosner Legal, PC
contact info
Lilach Halperin
contact info
Alexis Marie Wood
Law Office Of Ronald A. Marron
contact info

GPO Jun 21 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/20/2024. Opposition Deadline: 8/22/2024. Motion Deadline: 7/25/2024. Reply Deadline: 9/19/2024. (Maldonado, C)
GPO Jun 26 2024
ORDER GRANTING 12 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2024. Added attorney Keara M. Gordon, PHV for Quten Research Institute, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO Jun 26 2024
ORDER GRANTING 13 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2024. Added attorney William W. Reichart, PHV for Quten Research Institute, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO Aug 28 2024
ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion of Withdrawal of Counsel Lilach Halperin as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2024. Attorney Lilach Halperin terminated. (Rivera, O)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 4:27 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rex Delorme Brookhart on behalf of Anthony Swetala. Attorney Brookhart, Rex Delorme added. (Brookhart, Rex)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
37 37 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/25 9:58 AM
ANSWER by Quten Research Institute, LLC.(Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
36 36 misc Stipulation Wed 04/09 2:42 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT by Quten Research Institute, LLC. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
35 35 16 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/28 8:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant's20 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/28/2025. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
34 34 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/28 12:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for April 1, 2025 is continued to July 1, 2025, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motion to Dismiss (Doc.20 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/28/2025. (Deputy Clerk EV)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/03 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Exhibit A Thereto by Quten Research Institute, LLC re20 MOTION to DISMISS. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/21 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Anthony Swetala re27 Opposition to Motion. (Wood, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
31 31 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/23 11:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 12/2/2024 is continued to April 1, 2025, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motion to Dismiss (Doc.20 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/2024. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
30 30 misc Reply Thu 09/19 4:00 PM
REPLY by Quten Research Institute, LLC re20 Motion to Dismiss,. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/28 8:04 AM
ORDER GRANTING28 Motion of Withdrawal of Counsel Lilach Halperin as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2024. Attorney Lilach Halperin terminated . (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/23 9:08 AM
MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Anthony Swetala. (Halperin, Lilach)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
27 27 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 08/22 3:26 PM
OPPOSITION by Anthony Swetala to20 Motion to Dismiss,. (Marron, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/20 3:21 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alexis Marie Wood on behalf of Anthony Swetala. Attorney Wood, Alexis Marie added. (Wood, Alexis)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/20 3:17 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kas L. Gallucci on behalf of Anthony Swetala. Attorney Gallucci, Kas L. added. (Gallucci, Kas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 08/12 11:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING21 Defendant's Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference; ORDER Vacating Hearing August 30, 2024 Motion Hearing; ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/12/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
23 23 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 08/08 4:26 PM
OPPOSITION by Anthony Swetala to21 Motion to Continue,. (Marron, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
22 22 order Minute Order Tue 07/30 3:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to Local Rule 302, the filed motion to dismiss20 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. As set forth in the Court's standing order, no hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. As a result of the ongoing judicial resource emergency in this District, approximately 100 regular civil motions remain under submission before the undersigned. As a result, it is likely to be six or more months until the motion(s) in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent can alleviate the delay caused by the resource emergency. The parties SHALL reconsider magistrate judge consent for all purposes or only for this pending motion . In addition, the parties are reminded of their ongoing obligation to inform the Court of any changed circumstances that have rendered all or part of any pending motion moot. Finally, the parties are informed that the undersigned generally requires a formal settlement conference take place before any civil case proceeds to trial. Should the parties jointly wish to schedule a settlement conference, they are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Irma Munoz at imunoz@caed.uscourts.gov signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on July 30, 2024. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
21 21 motion Continue Thu 07/25 4:20 PM
MOTION to CONTINUE the Initial Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by Quten Research Institute, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Dismiss Thu 07/25 3:38 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Quten Research Institute, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Declaration of Isabelle L. Ord and Exhibits A-D Thereto
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
19 19 order Minute Order Wed 07/24 3:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties shall appear at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for August 27, 2024, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties shall be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/2024. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/11 3:45 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tia Nguyen on behalf of Quten Research Institute, LLC. Attorney Nguyen, Tia added. (Nguyen, Tia)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
17 17 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 07/01 2:13 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Anthony Swetala re16 Standing Order. (Halperin, Lilach)
Related: [-]
16 16 order JLT Standing Order Mon 07/01 1:06 PM
STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on July 1, 2024.. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/26 11:04 AM
ORDER GRANTING13 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2024. Added attorney William W. Reichart, PHV for Quten Research Institute, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/26 11:01 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2024. Added attorney Keara M. Gordon, PHV for Quten Research Institute, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
13 13 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Tue 06/25 4:48 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Quten Research Institute, LLC for attorney William W. Reichart III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11601889) (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Tue 06/25 4:44 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Quten Research Institute, LLC for attorney Keara M. Gordon to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11601870) (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Mon 06/24 8:12 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-00620-JLT-BAM . (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
10 10 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 06/21 2:54 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/21 7:53 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/20/2024. Opposition Deadline: 8/22/2024. Motion Deadline: 7/25/2024. Reply Deadline: 9/19/2024. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 06/18 6:53 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Quten Research Institute, LLC. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/18 6:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Quten Research Institute, LLC. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/18 6:48 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Isabelle Louise Ord on behalf of Quten Research Institute, LLC. Attorney Ord, Isabelle Louise added. (Ord, Isabelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/03 9:09 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Quten Research Institute, LLC served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Marron, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 05/28 8:09 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A(m),
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Tue 05/28 8:04 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Quten Research Institute, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ronald Marron* *651 Arroyo Drive* *San Diego, CA 92103*. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
2 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lilach Halperin on behalf of Anthony Swetala. Attorney Halperin, Lilach added. (Halperin, Lilach)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs COMPLAINT against Quten Research Institute, LLC by Anthony Swetala. Attorney Marron, Ronald added.(Marron, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
RECEIPT number ACAEDC-11544181 for $405.00 fbo Anthony Swetala from Ronald Marron. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]