Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:24-cv-00581
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 2:44 AM CST
Defendant
IHeartMedia Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Phillips
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Brandon Clement
Represented By
James H. Freeman
Sanders Law Group
contact info
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Friday, September 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/06 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Brandon Clement (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/26 11:19 AM
Text Order GRANTING7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's answer or responsive pleading be submitted to the Court on or before Monday, September 30, 2024. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 08/27 9:54 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: IHeartMedia Inc. answer due 9/30/2024. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 08/23 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey J. Phillips on behalf of IHeartMedia Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey J. Phillips added to party IHeartMedia Inc.(pty:dft) (Phillips, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/23 1:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by IHeartMedia Inc..(Phillips, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/12 2:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Brandon Clement. IHeartMedia Inc. served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
5 5 misc Report on Copyright (AO-121) Fri 06/07 2:10 PM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/31 10:42 AM
Summons Issued as to IHeartMedia Inc.. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/29 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Michael Brandon Clement. Attorney James H. Freeman added to party Michael Brandon Clement(pty:pla) (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/29 11:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michael Brandon Clement. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/29 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18817215), filed by Michael Brandon Clement.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Video,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Video,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/31 10:36 AM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 05/31 10:37 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rqr)
Related: [-]