Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:24-cv-11415
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Peter Donatelli
Defendant
New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
North Atlantic Carpenters Central Collection Agency
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
North Atlantic States Annuity Fund
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
North Atlantic States Carpenters Guaranteed Annuity Fund
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
North Atlantic States Carpenters Health Benefits Fund
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
North Atlantic States Carpenters Training Fund
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
North Atlantic States Carpenters Vacation Savings Fund
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of North Atlantic States Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By
Carey D. Shockey
Krakow, Souris, & Landry LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 20, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 12/20 3:41 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. For the reasons stated on the record at the December 12, 2024 damages hearing, [ECF No. 14 ], Plaintiff's motion for default, ECF No.10 ], is DENIED with leave to renew. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 minutes Hearing - Other Thu 12/12 10:41 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing held on 12/12/2024. Colloquy re: damages. Plaintiff will file an amended complaint. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Shockey) (Folan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Wed 12/11 6:09 PM
STATUS REPORT for December 12th Damages Hearing by North Atlantic Carpenters Central Collection Agency, Trustees of North Atlantic States Carpenters Pension Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Guaranteed Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Health Benefits Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Vacation Savings Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Training Fund. (Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 11/21 9:17 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing on Damages set for 12/12/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 (In person only) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 respoth Affidavit in Support Tue 08/27 12:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc. and Peter Donatelli .(Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 16, 2024
10 10 motion Default Judgment Fri 08/16 1:59 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc. and Peter Donatelli by North Atlantic Carpenters Central Collection Agency, North Atlantic States Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Guaranteed Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Health Benefits Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Training Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of North Atlantic States Carpenters Pension Fund.(Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
9 9 order Standing order on motions for default judgment Thu 07/18 12:46 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re8 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Notice of Entry of Default by Clerk Thu 07/18 12:30 PM
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Peter Donatelli, New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 motion Entry of Default Mon 07/15 1:24 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by North Atlantic Carpenters Central Collection Agency, North Atlantic States Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Guaranteed Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Health Benefits Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Training Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of North Atlantic States Carpenters Pension Fund.(Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/27 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Donatelli served on 6/12/2024, answer due 7/3/2024. (Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order To Show Cause Thu 06/27 9:21 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On June 17, 2024, Plaintiffs filed an affidavit of service demonstrating that the complaint was served on Defendant New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc. (?NEBBC?) on May 31, 2024. [ECF No.4 ]. There is no indication that the individual Defendant, Peter Donatelli, has been served. See [ id. ]. As of June 27, 2024, NEBBC has not answered or otherwise responded to the complaint. Plaintiffs shall file a request for entry of default as to NEBBC by July 18, 2024 or the action may be dismissed as to NEBBC. In addition, Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, in writing, by July 18, 2024 , as to whether they contend that Donatelli has been properly served, and if not, whether they intend to proceed against Donatelli. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/17 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc. and Peter Donatelli served on 5/31/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/29 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Jaylannie)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 05/29 2:57 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/29 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT against New England Building & Bridge Company, Inc. and Peter Donatelli Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10438643 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by North Atlantic Carpenters Central Collection Agency, North Atlantic States Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Guaranteed Annuity Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Health Benefits Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Training Fund, North Atlantic States Carpenters Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of North Atlantic States Carpenters Pension Fund.(Shockey, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet