Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joshua D Wolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02278
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Case in other court:Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, 240501606
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By
JOHN L. LAMB
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
MICHAEL EDWARD TRUNCELLITO
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GALVANI
Represented By
Austin Douglas Skelton
The Lacy Employment Law Firm
contact info
ANDREW LACY, JR.
The Lacy Employment Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 10/15 10:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/15/2024. 10/15/2024 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/04 1:32 PM
ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO THIS COURTS INHERENT AUTHORITY, PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL ANDREW LACY IS FORMALLY REPRIMANDED.SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/4/24. 9/4/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
20 20 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 09/03 12:47 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MICHAEL GALVANI. (LACY, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/03 12:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17644666.) filed by MICHAEL GALVANI. (LACY, ANDREW) Modified on 9/3/2024 (lvj). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL FILE CORRECT DOCUMENT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
18 18 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 08/27 4:46 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MICHAEL GALVANI.(LACY, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 08/27 3:32 PM
ORDER THAT ON OR SEPTEMBER 3, 2024, PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GALVANI SHALL SHOW CAUSE, IN A MEMORANDUM NOT TO EXCEED 5 PAGES, AS TO WHY I SHOULD NOT SANCTION HIM FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH MY PRIOR ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/27/2024. 8/27/2024 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/07 10:41 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/17/2024, AT 10:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 3C, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 8/7/24. 8/7/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 08/07 7:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Pretrial Conference held on 8/6/24 (amas)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 08/06 4:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 8/16/2024; THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A LETTER TO CHAMBERS IDENTIFYING THE DATES SET ASIDE FOR DEPOSITIONS ON OR BEFORE 8/20/2024; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL DISCOVERY BY 1/13/2025, AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 2/18/2025. ADDITIONAL INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, AS JUDGE REID DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/06/2024. 8/06/2024 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/06 10:23 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF AUSTIN D. SKELTON, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.11 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/6/24.8/6/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
12 12 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Fri 08/02 1:38 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) . (LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 08/01 4:25 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17644666.) filed by MICHAEL GALVANI..(LACY, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 12:20 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GALVANI AND DEFENDANT LOWES COMPANIES, INC. D/B/A LOWES OF HANOVER SHALL EACH FILE A DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1(a)(2) WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/30/2024. 7/30/2024 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/03 11:00 AM
ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A VIDEO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 8/6/2024 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/03/2024. 7/03/2024 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/01 3:04 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC..(LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/18 4:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC., filed by MICHAEL GALVANI.(LACY, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/10 3:52 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GALVANI MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 6/20/2024, WHICH DEFENDANT MAY ANSWER IN THE TIME PRESCRIBED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 15(A)(3) OR SUBMIT A NEW PREMOTION LETTER IN ACCORDANCE WITH MY POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANT MAY FILE A RENEWED PREMOTION LETTER ON OR BEFORE JUNE 28, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 6/10/2024. 6/10/2024 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
5 5 misc State Court Record - Attachment Fri 05/31 11:56 AM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN L. LAMB on behalf of LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 5:10 PM
NOTICE by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. Designation Form (TRUNCELLITO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 05/29 3:03 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC..(TRUNCELLITO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Wed 05/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17499555), filed by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC..(TRUNCELLITO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 05/29 4:06 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]