Idaho District Court
Judge:David C Nye
Case #: 4:24-cv-00262
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
American Staffing
Defendant
McCain Foods USA, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jasmine Devalera
1834.5 Almo Avenue
Burley, ID 83318


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/09 11:58 AM
ORDER - Devaleras Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt.1 ) is DENIED. Devaleras hostile work environment and retaliation claim under Title VII against McCain Foods and American Staffing in the Complaint (Dkt.2 ) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Devaleras Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt.3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order of Conditional Filing Wed 05/29 1:46 PM
ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 05/29 1:45 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Jasmine Devalera. Responses due by 6/20/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 05/29 1:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jasmine Devalera.(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/29 1:44 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jasmine Devalera. Responses due by 6/20/2024.(jd)
Related: [-]