Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:24-cv-11417
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Lauren Cetnor
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Dirkse
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Tyler Dougherty
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Jerome
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Sean Jones
Represented By
Andrew J. Brege
Johnson Rosati Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Grady Judd
Represented By
Andrew J. Brege
Johnson Rosati Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Locke
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Michigan State Police
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Polk County Sheriff's Office
Represented By
Andrew J. Brege
Johnson Rosati Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Austin McKenzie
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Roger D. Fleury, Jr.
22325 W 8 Mile Road A-19
Detroit, MI 48219
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Keith Bankson
Terminated: 08/07/2024
Represented By
Todd J. Shoudy
Fletcher, Fealko,
contact info
Defendant
Micheal L. Hulewicz
Terminated: 08/07/2024
Represented By
Todd J. Shoudy
Fletcher, Fealko,
contact info

GPO Nov 26 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EVra)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
28 28 order Judgment* Tue 11/26 1:24 PM
JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EVra)
Related: [-]
27 27 16 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/26 1:16 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part16 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EVra)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 11/26 1:27 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re28 Judgment and27 Opinion and Order on Roger D. Fleury, Jr at 22325 W 8 Mile Road, A-19, Detroit, MI 48219. (EVra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/15 4:18 PM
REPLY to Response re20 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer Defendants Polk County Sheriffs Office, Sheriff Grady Judd and Sean Jones Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Their Motion to Dismiss (included in ECF No. 23) filed by Sean Jones, Grady Judd, Polk County Sheriff's Office. (Brege, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Justice v Peterson
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
25 25 notice Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument* Tue 10/08 2:26 PM
Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re20 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer, and16 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 12(B)(1) & (6). (JMcC)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Vacating Show Cause* Tue 10/08 10:47 AM
Order Vacating22 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 10/08 2:29 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re24 Order Vacating an Order to Show Cause and25 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument on Roger D. Fleury at 22325 W 8 Mile Road, A-19, Detroit, MI 48219 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
23 23 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 10/01 3:58 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Roger D. Fleury, Jr. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
22 22 order Show Cause Wed 09/18 2:08 PM
ORDER for Roger D. Fleury, Jr to Show Cause why the currently unopposed motions (ECF Nos.16 and20 should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2024 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 09/18 2:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re22 Order to Show Cause on Roger D. Fleury Jr. at 22325 W 8 Mile Road, A-19, Detroit, MI 48219 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
21 21 trial Exhibit Tue 08/20 1:24 PM
EXHIBIT Index of Unpublished Authority re20 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer by Sean Jones, Grady Judd, Polk County Sheriff's Office (Brege, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Emerald Coast Finest Produce Co., Inc. v QSR Group Three, LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Heid v Rutkoski,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Hall v Berrien Cty.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Kyles v Cnty. of Oakland,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Bowles v Mich. Comm'n of Law Enforcement Standards
20 20 motion Dismiss Tue 08/20 1:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer by Sean Jones, Grady Judd, Polk County Sheriff's Office. (Brege, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
19 19 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/13 9:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Polk County Sheriff's Office served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (JHea)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/13 9:10 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grady Judd served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (JHea)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/13 9:09 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sean Jones served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 08/09 2:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 12(B)(1) & (6) AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Lauren Cetnor, Joshua Dirkse, Tyler Dougherty, Jeffrey Jerome, Aaron Locke, Austin McKenzie, Michigan State Police. (Damich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A - Lucas v. Awaad, 830 N.W. 2d 141 (Mich. App. 2013),
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B - People v. Boynton, 302 Mich. App. 632 (2013),
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C - Criss v. City of Kent, 867 F.2d 259 (6th Cir. 1988),
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex D - Sykes v. Anderson, 625 F.3d 294 (6th Cir. 2010)
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
15 15 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 08/07 2:43 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Keith Bankson and Micheal L. Hulewicz. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 08/05 4:37 PM
ORDER Denying as moot8 Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 08/05 4:38 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re14 Order on Roger D. Fleury, Jr., 22325 W 8 Mile Road, A-19, Detroit, MI 48219 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
13 13 service Certificate of Service Fri 08/02 3:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re12 Amended Complaint by Roger D. Fleury, Jr (JHea)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Tue 07/30 2:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Roger D. Fleury, Jr against All Defendants. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/25 11:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Keith Bankson served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; Lauren Cetnor served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; Joshua Dirkse served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; Micheal L. Hulewicz served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; Jeffrey Jerome served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; Aaron Locke served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; McKenzie served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024; Michigan State Police served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024. (LGra)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/15 2:10 PM
ORDER re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Micheal L. Hulewicz, Keith Bankson, and9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 12(B)(1) & (6) filed by McKenzie, Lauren Cetnor, Jeffrey Jerome, Michigan State Police, Tyler Dougherty, Aaron Locke, Joshua Dirkse. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 07/15 2:12 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re10 Order on Roger D. Fleury, Jr., 22325 W 8 Mile Road, A-19, Detroit, MI 48219 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 07/10 3:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 12(B)(1) & (6) by Lauren Cetnor, Joshua Dirkse, Tyler Dougherty, Jeffrey Jerome, Aaron Locke, McKenzie, Michigan State Police. (Damich, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 07/10 10:38 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Bankson, Micheal L. Hulewicz. (Shoudy, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Cain v. City of Detroit
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 07/10 10:36 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Todd J. Shoudy appearing on behalf of Keith Bankson, Micheal L. Hulewicz (Shoudy, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
6 6 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 07/09 2:41 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott L. Damich appearing on behalf of Lauren Cetnor, Joshua Dirkse, Tyler Dougherty, Jeffrey Jerome, Aaron Locke, McKenzie, Michigan State Police Appearance with Certificate of Service (Damich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 05/30 8:23 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
4 4 service Summonses Provided to Plaintiff for Service* Wed 05/29 3:23 PM
Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (TTho)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Wed 05/29 3:22 PM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
Related: [-]
1 1 62 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 05/29 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Roger D. Fleury, Jr against All Defendants Receipt No: 150010563 - Fee: $ 405. (TTho)
Related: [-]