Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-03036
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 29, 2025 11:30 PM EDT
Defendant
7th Gear Exotics LLC
5650 Groveport Road
Groveport, OH 43125
Represented By
Hannah Fard
Brunner Quinn Firm
contact info
Rick Louis Brunner
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Andy M Custer
Custer Law Group
contact info
Andy Custer
Custer Law Group
contact info
David A Goldstein
David A. Goldstein Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Patrick M Quinn
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Defendant
Tiff A. Cook
5650 Groveport Road
Groveport, OH 43125
Represented By
Hannah Fard
Brunner Quinn Firm
contact info
Rick Louis Brunner
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Andy M Custer
Custer Law Group
contact info
Andy Custer
Custer Law Group
contact info
David A Goldstein
David A. Goldstein Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Patrick M Quinn
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Defendant
ES Exotics LLC
6608 Bluebird Lane
Canal Winchester, OH 43110
Represented By
Patrick M Quinn
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Defendant
Ergi Sulejmani
6608 Bluebird Lane
Canal Winchester, OH 43110
Represented By
Hannah Fard
Brunner Quinn Firm
contact info
Rick Louis Brunner
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Patrick M Quinn
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Interested Party
Cunix Automotive Group, LLC
41 S. High Street 21st Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Jeremy Young
Roetzel & Andress Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Exotic Leasing, LLC
100 East Broad Street, Suite230
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Istvan Gajary
Peterson Conners LLP
contact info
Robert Huff Miller
Robert Huff Miller LLC
contact info
Gregory Scott Peterson
Peterson Law LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Saththia Lingan
Terminated: 07/18/2024
2424 Shroton Court
Powell, OH 43065
Represented By
David Michael DeVillers
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Adam Bartolozzi
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
63 63 3 pgs order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 04/21 3:27 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The parties understand that this case will be referred to an attorney mediator, or to the Magistrate Judge, for a settlement conference to a date to be determined. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties shall be filed by 7/31/2025. Initial Disclosures due by 5/1/2025. Discovery due by 1/15/2026. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrangea conference with the Court. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by the close of discovery. Dispositive motions due by 4/15/2026. Primary Expert due by 10/15/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/21/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/16 12:32 PM
NOTICE: The PPTC set for 4/22/2025 is VACATED. (See ECF NO.62 .) (sln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
62 62 5 pgs misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 04/15 6:55 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Exotic Leasing, LLC. (Gajary, Istvan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
61 61 3 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 9:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re58 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants 7th Gear Exotics LLC, Tiff A. Cook. (Quinn, Patrick)
Related: [-]