Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:24-cv-01002
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 12:49 AM PST
Defendant
Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Chad C. Butterfield
Wilson Elser
contact info
Kathy McCarthy
Wilson Elser
contact info
Plaintiff
AAAA Investments, LLC
Represented By
Peter B. Mortenson
Mortenson & Rafie
contact info
Darius Rafie
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 respm Reply Fri 03/21 3:53 PM
REPLY to Response to22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff AAAA Investments, LLC. (Mortenson, Peter)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Reply Fri 03/21 11:33 AM
REPLY to Response to23 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 respm Response Fri 03/07 4:50 PM
RESPONSE to23 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff AAAA Investments, LLC. Replies due by 3/21/2025. (Mortenson, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
24 24 respm Response Fri 02/28 10:05 AM
RESPONSE to22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Replies due by 3/14/2025. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
23 23 motion Motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/14 2:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 56 by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/7/2025. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
22 22 motion Motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 02/07 5:00 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Limited Issue of Coverage by Plaintiff AAAA Investments, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2025. (Mortenson, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 02/03 3:56 PM
ORDER Granting18 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Stipulated Facts and Joint Appendix for Dispositive Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 2/3/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
20 20 misc Appendix Fri 01/31 4:48 PM
APPENDIX - JOINT STIPULATED UNDISPUTED FACTS FOR USE IN DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to19 Stipulation by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy Issued to AAAA Investments, LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Aida Torossian,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence Between Twin City and AAAA Investments, LLC,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Titlemax Lease Agreemen,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Second Amendment to Titlemax Lease Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter Terminating Titlemax Lease Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Lease Agreement Between AAAA and Nevada Tire,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Nevada Tire to AAAA,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Antioch Lease Agreemen,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Antioch Videos of the Subject Property,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Check from Antioch to AAAA,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Correspondence from Antioch to AAAA Dated October 6, 2023,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Estimates for Improvements Obtained by Antioch,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - LM Construction Co. Proposal,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - NV Energy Bills,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Oahu Air Invoice,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - LVMPD Case Report No. LLV231000007670,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Clark County, Nevada Permit Search Results,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Claim Acknowledgment,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Loss Report with Inspection Photos
19 19 motion Stipulation Fri 01/31 4:38 PM
STIPULATION - JOINT STIPULATED UNDISPUTED FACTS FOR USE IN DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad) (other) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
18 18 motion Stipulation Tue 01/28 3:49 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Submit Joint Stipulated Facts and Joint Appendix for Dispositive Motions by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad) (extend) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 01/24 1:39 PM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re Dispositive Motions Deadlines. Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/14/2025. Response briefs due by 3/7/2025. Reply brief due by 3/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 1/23/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) Modified on 1/24/2025 (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 motion Stipulation Tue 01/21 12:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Dispositive Motions Deadlines by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad) (extend) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 12:08 PM
ORDER Granting14 Stipulation Pending Dispositive Motions. The above stipulation of the Parties is hereby approved and entered. This matter is stayed pending resolution of the cross-motions and all remaining scheduling deadlines are vacated. The parties' Joint Status Report addressed in Paragraph 18 shall be titled 'Stipulated Status Report and Discovery Scheduling Order' and shall include new proposed discovery and pre-trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 12/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation Tue 12/17 4:26 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY Pending Dispositive Motions by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad) (stay) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 09/16 10:55 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (GA)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 09/16 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 9/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 09/05 4:17 PM
Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
order Standing Order Wed 08/28 10:14 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Fri 06/21 1:28 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 06/13 3:54 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 06/13 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AAAA Investments, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rafie, Darius)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 06/12 1:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AAAA Investments, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rafie, Darius)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Wed 06/05 2:23 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/15/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/20/2024.(Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
order Standing Order Fri 05/31 3:07 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 05/30 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/30/2024. By Deputy Clerk: ALZ. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/14/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/29/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 05/29 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Twin City Fire Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Twin City Fire Insurance Company added. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Wed 05/29 2:41 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-891581-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7700905) by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/8/2024. (Butterfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Index Index of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proof of Service
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 05/30 2:12 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (ALZ)
Related: [-]