New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:24-bk-42242
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Dismissed:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
399 Sackett LLC
399 Sackett St
Brooklyn, NY 11231-5069
Represented By
399 Sackett LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 10/30 8:58 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (one)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Thu 09/19 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Mon 09/16 8:49 AM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. Signed on 9/13/2024 (one)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Fri 08/09 10:37 AM
Hearing Held; - Appearances: Reema Lateef from the Office of the United States Trustee. Related [+] Case Dismissed; Court to issue order (jag)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Fri 08/09 10:39 AM
Hearing Held; - Appearances: Reema Lateef from Office of the United States Trustee. Related [+] Marked Off (jag)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Friday, July 12, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11 Sat 07/13 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
9 9 court Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case Wed 07/10 10:29 AM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel.Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. . Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 7/24/2024. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 399 Sackett LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Wed 07/10 2:18 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Nazar Khodorovsky from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 08/07/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Sunday, July 07, 2024
trustee Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Sun 07/07 3:20 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 7/10/2024 at 03:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 953-2748, Participant Code 3415538, Enter # sign. (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Thu 06/20 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 06/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 16, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Sun 06/16 8:55 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 6/16/2024 Status hearing to be held on 7/10/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 06/03 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 06/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sat 06/01 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 05/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
4 4 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Thu 05/30 1:59 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/8/2024 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 953-2748, Participant Code 3415538, Enter # sign. (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Wed 05/29 2:47 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Voluntary Petition [NAICS Code] due by 5/29/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 5/29/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 5/29/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 5/29/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 5/29/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 5/29/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 5/29/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 6/12/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 6/12/2024. (jjf)
Related: [-]
1 1 47 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 05/29 2:27 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by 399 Sackett LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/26/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2024. (jjf)
Related: [-]
utility ~Force Judge Assignment Wed 05/29 2:36 PM
Judge Assigned Due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. (jjf)
Related: [-]
court Prior Filings Wed 05/29 2:37 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 1 24-40317 jmm Dismissed: 03/06/2024 (jjf)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Wed 05/29 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00. Receipt Number 10333597. (JF) (admin)
Related: [-]