Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles R Merrill
Case #: 3:24-bk-31386
Case Filed:May 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Becker, Inc.
7521 Outer Loop
Louisville, KY 40228-1726
Represented By
Charity S Bird
Kaplan Johnson Abate & Bird LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Asst. U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 12:01 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
181 181 order Amended Motion/Application Wed 04/30 3:57 PM
Order Granting180 Second Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Plan by May 5, 2025. Entered on 4/30/2025. (CB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
180 180 motion Amended Motion/ Application Tue 04/29 6:01 PM
Second Amended Motion/Application to Extend Time to File Amended Chapter 11 Plan Related [+] Filed by Debtor Becker, Inc.. (Dennery, Jean Christian)
Related: [-] 172 Amended Motion to Extend time to File Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Becker, Inc.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
179 179 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 04/26 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 178 Order of the Court to continue hearing held on April 22, 2025 on Motion to Amend Allowed Administrative Claim 86 Order Granting79 Motion For Relief From Stay, Rejection of Lease and Related Relief Filed by Creditor Taylorhurst, LLC.144 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Merrill. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202 . (AMG) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
178 178 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Wed 04/23 7:56 AM
Order of the Court to continue hearing held on April 22, 2025 on Motion to Amend Allowed Administrative Claim 86 Order Granting79 Motion For Relief From Stay, Rejection of Lease and Related Relief Filed by Creditor Taylorhurst, LLC.144 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Merrill. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202 . (AMG)
Related: [-]