Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Lindsay S Griffin
Case #: 8:24-cv-01308
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, 24-CA-003017
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC
Represented By
Fredrick H. L. McClure
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,
contact info
Bradley Arthur Muhs
Trenam Law
contact info
Bradley A. Muhs
Trenam Law
contact info
Mediator
Stacy Estes Yates
Represented By
Stacy Estes Yates
Older Lundy Koch & Martino
contact info
Plaintiff
Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By
James Doyle Henderson
Frese, Whitehead & Anderson, P.A.
contact info
Allan Paxton Whitehead
Frese, Whitehead & Anderson, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 4:53 PM
NOTICE by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC of service of proposal for settlement (Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
28 28 adr Mediation report Wed 04/02 2:53 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 4/1/2025. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Yates, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator/Scheduling Mediation Tue 02/11 9:32 AM
ORDER scheduling mediation before Stacy Yates as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/11/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 02/10 4:26 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 04/01/25 at 9:00 a.m. before Stacy Yates. (Whitehead, Allan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
25 25 order Order Wed 01/22 10:11 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the 23 Amended Case Management Scheduling Order, the mediation is incorrectly scheduled to be conducted before the dispositive motion filing deadline. The Order is hereby amended as follows: Lead counsel must file a notice of mediation before the court-appointed mediator Stacy E. Yates on or before September 24, 2025, and mediation must be conducted by October 24, 2025. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/22/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Tue 11/12 12:47 PM
ORDER appointing Stacy Estes Yates as mediator in this action. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required absent Court order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/12/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 11/08 1:08 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery is due by 10/24/2025. Dispositive motions are due by 11/21/2025. Pretrial statement is due by 4/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/9/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial is set for the May 2026 Trial Term commencing 5/4/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/7/2024. (JCG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
22 22 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/04 3:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. New case number: 8:24-cv-1308-WFJ-LSG. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 08/12 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Allan Paxton Whitehead on behalf of Allied Trust Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Allan P. Whitehead. (Whitehead, Allan)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 4:48 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC.(Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 07/29 12:50 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. The Court has reviewed the pleadings and the docket filings. The complaint surmounts the low bar of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a). It is plain what is alleged and what Defendant must respond to. Although the statute of frauds was well addressed, it is unclear factually precisely how it will play out, regarding for example the length of performance due, Plaintiff's alleged full performance and the timeframe of that, whether the subject email is sufficient to take the case out of the statute of frauds or otherwise bears on the equitable remedy sought, etc. The issues are not so clear-cut that they can be decided on the record at this stage. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/29/2024. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 07/17 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradley Arthur Muhs on behalf of Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC. Lead Counsel: Bradley A. Muhs. (Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 07/16 3:11 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 07/16 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bradley Arthur Muhs of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/15 6:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC. (Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
14 14 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 07/09 8:13 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery is due by 10/24/2025. Dispositive motions are due by 11/28/2025. Pretrial statement is due by 4/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/9/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial is set for the May 2026 Trial Term commencing 5/4/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/9/2024. (JCG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 8:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Whitehead, Allan)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Case Management Report Mon 07/08 4:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Whitehead, Allan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 06/17 4:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC. (Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/04 5:19 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brian Keefer, Corporate Parent Allied Trust Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis, P.A., Other Affiliate Whitehead, Allan P., Other Affiliate Frese Whitehead & Anderson, P.A., Other Affiliate James D. Henderson, James, Other Affiliate Claudric Adams, Other Affiliate Bradley A Muhs, Other Affiliate Fredrick H.L. McClure, Other Affiliate Curtis B. Leitner, Other Affiliate McCarter & English, LLP for Allied Trust Insurance Company.. (Whitehead, Allan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 06/04 5:10 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Allied Trust Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Whitehead, Allan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/03 5:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC's answer or response due 6/17/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/3/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 06/03 4:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC. (Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/31 1:15 PM
NOTICE by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC (McClure, Fredrick)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 8:32 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/30 11:30 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 824-cv-1308-WFJ-UAM. (AA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/29 9:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC. (Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/29 9:08 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 24-CA-003017 filed in State Court on 04/12/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22142031 filed by Guy Carpenter & Company, LLC.(Muhs, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 6 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 7 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 8 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet