Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:24-cv-00487
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:May 24, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/11 2:44 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL SHOW CAUSE ORDER. It is ORDERED that Habtemariam's motion to expand the record, Dkt.6 , is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the United States Attorney, on behalf of the United States of America, has 45 days from the receipt of this order to answer Habtemariam's claims of ineffective assistance of counsel in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and to show cause why the relief prayed for should not be granted. It is further ORDERED that the United States provide an affidavit from trial counsel, Anthony Paul Eiland, addressing Habtemariam's claims of ineffective assistance of counsel with the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 4/11/2025. (xl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
10 10 respoth Response to Non-Motion Wed 10/30 5:47 PM
REPLY to9 Response filed by Robel Habtemariam . (baf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
9 9 respoth Response to Non-Motion Mon 09/23 2:50 PM
RESPONSE to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OUT-OF-TIME APPEAL filed by USA . (Visosky, Bradley)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 09/23 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley E Visosky on behalf of USA (Visosky, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 09/16 9:48 AM
ORDER. It is accordingly ORDERED that Respondent's motion for an extension of time (Dkt.5 ) is GRANTED. Respondent shall file its Response no later than October 21, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 9/15/2024. (baf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/10 11:50 AM
MOTION to Expand Record by Robel Habtemariam.(baf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Cover letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/03 11:12 AM
Pursuant to[LINK:General Order 24-06] , case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/30 10:41 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 Order to Answer, by USA.(Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 08/02 9:22 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Robel Habtemariam. (knp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order to Answer Mon 07/08 2:46 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER. ORDERED that the United States Attorney, on behalf of the United States of America, shall have sixty days from the receipt of this Order to answer the motion in full compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and to show cause why the relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/8/2024. (daj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/29 5:46 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate referral
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Wed 05/29 5:42 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Robel Habtemariam. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope