Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Case #: 3:19-cv-02440
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2019
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 30, 2024 9:17 PM CDT
Defendant
Brent A Felix
Defendant
Garth L Felix
Defendant
Innovasis Inc
Plaintiff
Robert Richardson
Represented By
Nathan Franklin Garrett
Graves Garrett Greim LLC
contact info
Scott L Harper
Harper & Bates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrew Stricker Robbins-DOJ
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Olga Yevtukhova
U.S. Department Of Justice- Commercial Litigation Branch
contact info
George M Padis-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jessica Krieg
U.S. Department Of Justice- Commercial Litigation Branch
contact info
Jamie Yavelberg
Us Attorney'S Office - Civil Division
contact info
Colin M Huntley
U.S. Department Of Justice- Commercial Litigation Branch
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
54 54 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 07/29 11:59 AM
DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all claims in this action in accordance with the parties' stipulation. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/29/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
53 53 misc Stipulation Fri 07/26 3:45 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by the United States and Relator by USA. (Padis-DOJ, George)
Related: [-]