Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00294
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 30, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Eduardo Rosas-Soto (1)
Represented By
Julianna Andrea Sosa
Sosa Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose A Esquivel, Jr
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/30/2024 3:05 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 5/15/2024 as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. The defendant testifies to the Court that he cannot afford to hire his own counsel and the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appoint of counsel. The Court will appoint counsel to represent the defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 05/22/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. DETENTION HEARING held. Bond set at $25,000 Cash Deposit with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community, as ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Luis Salazar, AUSA; (USPO: A Cardenas/ B Mora) (ERO: D Reyna) (Interpreter: M Hanson) (DUSM: T Trevino) (CSO: P Castro) (als1) (9:36-9:50AM) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Jose A Esquivel, Jr appearing for USA, filed. (Esquivel, Jose) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto (1), filed. (Cameron) (dlr1) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto arrested on 5/13/2024, filed. (dlr1) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Eduardo Rosas-Soto. Julianna A. Sosa appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
5 5 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Eduardo Rosas-Soto in the case of Eduardo Rosas-Soto, filed. (Sosa, Julianna) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto, filed. (nac1) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Eduardo Rosas-Soto, filed. (Sosa, Julianna) [1:24-mj-00286]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto (1) count(s) 1, filed. (edg1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto, filed. (edg1)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Eduardo Rosas-Soto. Arraignment set for 6/6/2024 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III, filed. (edg1)
Related: [-]