California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-04484
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 12:16 AM PST
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Richard C. Burson
Ausa - Us Attorneys Offce
contact info
Defendant
Lory Torres
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Richard C. Burson
Ausa - Us Attorneys Offce
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Richard C. Burson
Ausa - Us Attorneys Offce
contact info
Plaintiff
Aya Suzuki
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hidemi Suzuki
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kana Suzuki
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shoichi Suzuki
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 10/15 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Shoichi Suzuki, Aya Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
17 17 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 09/09 5:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS'COMPLAINT16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The time within which Defendants must answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is October 21, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
16 16 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 09/05 11:27 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/21/2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Lory Torres, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Burson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 08/14 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-04484 MWF(PVCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 08/01 7:48 AM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou answer now due 9/5/2024; Lory Torres answer now due 9/5/2024; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer now due 9/5/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou; Lory Torres; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Richard C. Burson added to party Ur Mendoza Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Richard C. Burson added to party Lory Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Richard C. Burson added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Burson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
13 13 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Thu 07/18 10:43 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiffs Aya Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Shoichi Suzuki. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 07/18 10:03 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A)11 , Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge10 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The document is stricken. - For assistance in properly e-filing documents, counsel may contact the Help Desk at (213) 894-0242 or ecf-helpdesk@cacd.uscourts.gov (hr)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 07/18 10:00 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Civil Events -> Other Filings -> Consents to Proceed CV-11C. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 07/10 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form4 , Reminder Notice to Counsel (CV-14) re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project - optional html form,9 (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Wed 07/10 12:07 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
8 8 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 06/20 10:07 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shoichi Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Aya Suzuki, upon Defendant Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024; Lory Torres served on 6/13/2024, answer due 8/12/2024; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Stela Rose. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Jeff. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached.(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit mail receipt
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/07 9:13 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Lory Torres, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 06/05 12:12 AM
MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Mon 06/03 12:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Aya Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Shoichi Suzuki. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 06/03 8:50 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge
Thursday, May 30, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 05/30 6:11 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aya Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Shoichi Suzuki, (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 05/30 6:07 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Aya Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Shoichi Suzuki. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/30 5:59 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37556653 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Shoichi Suzuki, Hidemi Suzuki, Kana Suzuki, Aya Suzuki. (Attorney Christina Sullivan Castro added to party Aya Suzuki(pty:pla), Attorney Christina Sullivan Castro added to party Hidemi Suzuki(pty:pla), Attorney Christina Sullivan Castro added to party Kana Suzuki(pty:pla), Attorney Christina Sullivan Castro added to party Shoichi Suzuki(pty:pla))(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]