Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:24-cv-02317
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
INDUCTEV, INC.
Represented By
ANDREW S. ESLER
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN M. TAGGART
Represented By
ANDREW OLCESE
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
SAMANTHA P. MARTIN
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 25, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 10/25 11:12 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/25/24. 10/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Fri 10/25 9:03 AM
Letter dated October 25, 2024 by RYAN M. TAGGART. (MARTIN, SAMANTHA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 09/24 3:08 PM
ORDER OF 9/24/24 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO ALLOW FOR ARBITRATION OF CLAIMS (ECF NO. 9) AND THE JOINT WRITTEN STATUS UPDATE DATED SEPTEMBER 23, 2024 (SENT VIA EMAIL), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT JOINT WRITTEN STATUS UPDATES ON THE FIRST BUSINESS DAY OF EACH MONTH BEGINNING ON NOVEMBER 1, 2024. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/24/24. 9/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Tue 07/30 10:09 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT RESPECTFULLY REQUEST THAT THIS COURT GRANT THE INSTANT REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO ALLOW THE PARTIES TO RESOLVE PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT THROUGH BINDING ARBITRATION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/29/24. 7/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 07/30 8:55 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INDUCTEV, INC..(ESLER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/29 5:06 PM
ORDER THAT INDUCTEV, INC., IS TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT2 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS A REMINDER TO THE PARTIES OF THEIR CONTINUING OBLIGATION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(B)(2) TO PROMPTLY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF ANY CHANGES TO THE INFORMATION REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/29/24. 7/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. ESLER on behalf of INDUCTEV, INC. with Certificate of Service(ESLER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/05 11:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RYAN M. TAGGART. INDUCTEV, INC. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/30 6:06 PM
Summons Issued as to INDUCTEV, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/30/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA P. MARTIN on behalf of RYAN M. TAGGART (MARTIN, SAMANTHA)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of RYAN M. TAGGART (OLCESE, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 05/30 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against INDUCTEV, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17502229.), filed by RYAN M. TAGGART.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]