Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 1:24-cv-22073
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1443cv Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Cases
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024
Case in other court:Eleventh Judicial Circuit, 24-079240-CC-25
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC
Represented By
Todd Rosenbaum
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Pete S Michaels
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By
Nolan Keith Klein
Law Offices Of Nolan Klein, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 07/30 8:43 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 7/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 07/26 4:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jesus Gonzalez (Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 07/24 10:28 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re14 Order Staying Case. Show Cause Response due by 7/26/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 7/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 06/24 2:10 PM
Order Cancelling Status Conference set for June 26, 2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 6/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 06/21 10:43 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 6/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Wed 06/19 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jesus Gonzalez (Klein, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Tue 06/11 7:55 AM
ORDER Scheduling Status Conferences: Status Conference set for 6/26/2024 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 6/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 06/06 12:57 PM
ORDER granting8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC. Response/Answer due 7/8/2024 ; granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. (Joint Scheduling Report due 7/15/2024). Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 6/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 06/06 12:46 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint . Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 06/05 10:33 AM
STATUS REPORT -Removal Status Report- by Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC (Michaels, Pete)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/05 10:31 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2024. (Michaels, Pete)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 3:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Todd Rosenbaum. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/31/2024. (sm00)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
6 6 order Status Report Order Fri 05/31 7:09 AM
ORDER: Removal Status Report due by 6/10/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 05/31 7:06 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/13/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 05/30 4:57 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Todd Rosenbaum. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17570147 by Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC. Responses due by 6/13/2024. (Michaels, Pete)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/30 3:06 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC (Michaels, Pete)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/30 2:30 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 05/30 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Jesus Gonzalez v. Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC, d/b/a The Benjamin Royal Sonesta New York) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17568948, filed by Sonesta Benjamin Hotel, LLC.(Michaels, Pete) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 5/30/2024 (ar24)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, State Court Complaint
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet